This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/22/2019 at 12:58:29 (UTC).

NEWCODS LLC VS SANTIAGO HERRERA

Case Summary

On 03/01/2013 NEWCODS LLC filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against SANTIAGO HERRERA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Van Nuys Courthouse East located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is RICHARD F. WALMARK. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****1273

  • Filing Date:

    03/01/2013

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Courthouse:

    Van Nuys Courthouse East

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

RICHARD F. WALMARK

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

NEWCODS LLC

Defendant

SANTIAGO HERRERA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DENNIS P. BLOCK & ASSOCIATES

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/05/2015
  • DocketCASE DESTROYED PURSUANT TO GC 68152 D(1)/GC 68152 D(2)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2013
  • DocketWRIT RETURNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2013
  • DocketDEFAULT JUDGMENT BY CLERK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2013
  • DocketAPPLICATION FOR ISSUANCE OF WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED+

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2013
  • DocketWRIT OF POSSESSION OF REAL PROPERTY ISSUED TO LA COUNTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2013
  • DocketMEMO TO SET CASE FOR TRIAL FILED-20 MIN(S) * * REJECTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2013
  • DocketMEMO TO SET REJECTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2013
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE TO COMPLAINT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2013
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DEFAULT FILED AND ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2013
  • DocketSUBMISSION FOR DEFAULT AND JUDGMENT PENDING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2013
  • DocketORDER TO POST SUMMONS SIGNED BY JUDGE RICHARD F. WALMARK++

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2013
  • DocketAPPLICATION AND ORDER TO POST SUMMONS SUBMITTED+

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2013
  • DocketNOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER MAILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2013
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2013
  • DocketSUMMONS FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where NEWCODS LLC is a litigant