Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/19/2021 at 05:08:34 (UTC).

NEW BIRTH BUILDERS, INC. VS GEORGE FIELDS

Case Summary

On 07/28/2020 NEW BIRTH BUILDERS, INC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against GEORGE FIELDS. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is JAMES E. BLANCARTE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6289

  • Filing Date:

    07/28/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

JAMES E. BLANCARTE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

NEW BIRTH BUILDERS INC.

Defendant

FIELDS GEORGE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WOLFE TODD

Defendant Attorney

SZABO LAWRENCE JAY

 

Court Documents

Substitution of Attorney - Substitution of Attorney

2/25/2021: Substitution of Attorney - Substitution of Attorney

Notice (name extension) - Notice of Withdrawal of Motion to Strike Complaint

3/9/2021: Notice (name extension) - Notice of Withdrawal of Motion to Strike Complaint

Answer - Answer

3/18/2021: Answer - Answer

Motion to Strike (not anti-SLAPP) - without Demurrer - Motion to Strike (not anti-SLAPP) - without Demurrer

9/2/2020: Motion to Strike (not anti-SLAPP) - without Demurrer - Motion to Strike (not anti-SLAPP) - without Demurrer

Complaint - Complaint

7/28/2020: Complaint - Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

7/28/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - Summons on Complaint

7/28/2020: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

7/28/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

7/28/2020: First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/01/2023
  • Hearing08/01/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 25 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2022
  • Hearing01/25/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 25 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: George Fields (Defendant); As to: New Birth Builders, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • DocketHearing on Motion to Strike (not anti-SLAPP) - without Demurrer scheduled for 03/18/2021 at 10:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 03/16/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • DocketNotice of Withdrawal of Motion to Strike Complaint; Filed by: George Fields (Defendant); As to: New Birth Builders, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorney; Filed by: New Birth Builders, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2020
  • DocketHearing on Motion to Strike (not anti-SLAPP) - without Demurrer scheduled for 03/18/2021 at 10:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2020
  • DocketMotion to Strike (not anti-SLAPP) - without Demurrer; Filed by: George Fields (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: New Birth Builders, Inc. (Plaintiff); As to: George Fields (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: New Birth Builders, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2020
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2020
  • DocketFirst Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. James E. Blancarte in Department 25 Spring Street Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2020
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 01/25/2022 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 08/01/2023 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer SZABO LAWRENCE J.