This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/13/2016 at 13:51:23 (UTC).

NETWORK COMMERCIAL SERVICE INC VS GUARDIAN NATIONAL INC

Case Summary

On 06/07/2012 NETWORK COMMERCIAL SERVICE INC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against GUARDIAN NATIONAL INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Chatsworth Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****4471

  • Filing Date:

    06/07/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Courthouse:

    Chatsworth Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

NETWORK COMMERCIAL SERVICE INC

Defendant

GUARDIAN NATIONAL INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SIEGEL, EDWIN B.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/20/2015
  • CASE DESTROYED PURSUANT TO GC 68152 D(1)/GC 68152 D(2)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2012
  • HEARING DELETED - OFF CALENDAR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2012
  • DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE-ENTIRE ACTION, FILED & ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2012
  • PROOF OF SERVICE TO COMPLAINT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2012
  • SUBSERV 06/21/12 DEC DIL ATTACHED MAILED 06/25/12

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2012
  • OSC SET 12/20/12, 0830 AM, DEPT. F46, NOTICE FILED & MAILED * * DELETED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2012
  • COMPLAINT FILED - COLLECTION CASE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2012
  • SUMMONS FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2012
  • NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT FILED AND COPY GIVEN TO PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where GUARDIAN NATIONAL INC. is a litigant