This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/21/2019 at 12:53:22 (UTC).

NERY ENTERTAINMENT VS GARCIA, BENNY

Case Summary

On 04/13/2017 NERY ENTERTAINMENT filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against GARCIA, BENNY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****4532

  • Filing Date:

    04/13/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

RIVERA ELIAS

RIVERA NERY

NERY ENTERTAINMENT

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

GARCIA BENNY

NERY ENTERTAINMENT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Cross Defendant Attorneys

MANIATES, SPEROS P

MANIATES SPEROS P

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorney

LAW OFFICE OF JOHN F GARCIA

Other Attorneys

QUINONES GILBERT

 

Court Documents

Cross-Complaint

6/5/2017: Cross-Complaint

Answer

8/11/2017: Answer

Response (name extension) - GENERAL DENIAL

6/5/2017: Response (name extension) - GENERAL DENIAL

Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

10/15/2018: Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

12/17/2018: Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

3/18/2019: Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

1/11/2019: Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

Stipulation (name extension) - No Order - Stipulation - No Order re: settlement

1/11/2019: Stipulation (name extension) - No Order - Stipulation - No Order re: settlement

Summons

4/13/2017: Summons

Substitution of Attorney

10/15/2018: Substitution of Attorney

Civil Case Cover Sheet

4/13/2017: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint - Other Collection Case

4/13/2017: Complaint - Other Collection Case

Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

1/8/2019: Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

Proof of Personal Service

8/11/2017: Proof of Personal Service

Substitution of Attorney

10/13/2017: Substitution of Attorney

Notice of Rejection - Fax Filing - Notice of Rejection - Fax Filing

10/12/2018: Notice of Rejection - Fax Filing - Notice of Rejection - Fax Filing

Answer

8/11/2017: Answer

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/18/2019
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by: NERY ENTERTAINMENT (Plaintiff); BENNY GARCIA (Cross-Complainant); NERY RIVERA (Plaintiff); ELIAS RIVERA (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2019
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by NERY ENTERTAINMENT, et al. on 04/13/2017, entered Request for Dismissal with prejudice filed by ELIAS RIVERA, NERY ENTERTAINMENT, NERY RIVERA, and BENNY GARCIA as to the entire action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2019
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) scheduled for 03/19/2019 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 03/18/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2019
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 04/13/2020 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 03/18/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2019
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) scheduled for 03/19/2019 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2019
  • DocketStipulation - No Order re: settlement; Filed by: NERY ENTERTAINMENT (Plaintiff); NERY RIVERA (Plaintiff); ELIAS RIVERA (Plaintiff); As to: BENNY GARCIA (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2019
  • DocketMinute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2019
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 01/11/2019 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94 updated: Result Date to 01/11/2019; Result Type to Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2019
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 01/11/2019 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2019
  • DocketMinute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
13 More Docket Entries
  • 08/11/2017
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: NERY ENTERTAINMENT (Plaintiff); NERY RIVERA (Plaintiff); ELIAS RIVERA (Plaintiff); As to: BENNY GARCIA (Defendant); Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2017
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: NERY RIVERA (Cross-Defendant); ELIAS RIVERA (Cross-Defendant); Nery Entertainment (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2017
  • DocketCROSS COMPLAINT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2017
  • DocketRESPONSE FILED - GENERAL DENIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2017
  • DocketNON-JURY TRIAL SET FOR 10/15/18, 08:30 AM, DEPT 77

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2017
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: NERY ENTERTAINMENT (Plaintiff); NERY RIVERA (Plaintiff); ELIAS RIVERA (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2017
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED - OTHER COLLECTION CASE Filing Fee: 370.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2017
  • DocketSUMMONS FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2017
  • DocketOSC SET 04/13/20, 08:30 AM, DEPT. 77 PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2017
  • DocketCROSS COMPLAINT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less