This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/25/2017 at 10:01:08 (UTC).

NELSON N. ALDANA VS JONELL STRAIN

Case Summary

On 01/26/2017 NELSON N ALDANA filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against JONELL STRAIN. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Alhambra Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is TONY L. RICHARDSON. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0753

  • Filing Date:

    01/26/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

TONY L. RICHARDSON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ALDANA NELSON N.

Defendants

STRAIN JONELL

STRAIN JONELL AKA JONELL ADAMS

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

5/30/2017: Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

Minute Order - (Ruling on Submitted Matter)

5/31/2017: Minute Order - (Ruling on Submitted Matter)

Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

6/7/2017: Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

[Notice to Judgment Creditor (Small Claims)]

6/29/2017: [Notice to Judgment Creditor (Small Claims)]

Request to Pay Judgment to Court

6/28/2017: Request to Pay Judgment to Court

Satisfaction of Judgment on Request to Pay Judgment to Court

6/28/2017: Satisfaction of Judgment on Request to Pay Judgment to Court

Judgment Creditor's Request for Funds

7/12/2017: Judgment Creditor's Request for Funds

Unknown

8/15/2017: Unknown

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

1/26/2017: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

2/2/2017: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

3/28/2017: Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

Minute Order of 03/28/2017

3/28/2017: Minute Order of 03/28/2017

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/19/2017
  • Refund Requested - $2,853.13

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2017
  • Refund Approved - $2,853.13

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2017
  • Transfer Amount = $2,853.13; Receipt # : STRM-2017-0001058-1; From : 17AHSC00753; To :

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2017
  • Judgment Creditor's Request for Funds; Filed by: Nelson N. Aldana (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2017
  • Updated -- Judgment entered on 06/29/2017 ; Status Date changed from 05/31/2017 to 06/29/2017 ; Status changed from Entered to Satisfied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2017
  • Updated -- Judgment entered on 06/29/2017 ; Status Date changed from 06/29/2017 to 06/29/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2017
  • Updated -- Judgment entered on 06/29/2017 ; Status Date changed from 06/29/2017 to 06/29/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2017
  • Notice to Judgment Creditor (Small Claims); Filed by: As to: Nelson N. Aldana (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2017
  • Certificate of Mailing for [Notice to Judgment Creditor (Small Claims)]; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2017
  • Request to Pay Judgment to Court; Filed by: Jonell Strain (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 05/30/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 05/30/2017 at 08:30 AM in Alhambra Courthouse at Department NE2 updated: Result Date to 05/30/2017; Result Type to Held - Taken under Submission

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2017
  • Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2017
  • Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order of 03/28/2017; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 03/28/2017 at 08:30 AM in Alhambra Courthouse at Department NE2 Not Held - Continued - Court Congestion to 05/30/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 05/30/2017 at 08:30 AM in Alhambra Courthouse at Department NE2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2017
  • Proof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Nelson N. Aldana (Plaintiff); As to: Jonell Strain (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 01/30/2017; Service Cost: 65.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2017
  • Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Nelson N. Aldana (Plaintiff); As to: Jonell Strain (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2017
  • Invoice: Small Claims >$ 5,000 to $10,000- CCP116.230(b)(3);CCP 116.221; Fee: $75.00; Payment: 75.00 Receipt: AH-2017-0008516 (Credit Card); Balance: $0.00;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2017
  • Case assigned to Hon. Tony L. Richardson at Alhambra Courthouse in Department NE2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 03/28/2017 at 08:30 AM in Alhambra Courthouse at Department NE2

    Read MoreRead Less