Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/28/2020 at 03:30:53 (UTC).

NEHEMIAH KONG VS ANGELA CONTOS, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 11/08/2019 NEHEMIAH KONG filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against ANGELA CONTOS. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is SERENA R. MURILLO. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0427

  • Filing Date:

    11/08/2019

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

SERENA R. MURILLO

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

KONG NEHEMIAH

Defendants

GOLDEN STAR FAMILY RESTAURANTS INC. A CALIFIRNIA CORPORATION

CONTOS ANGELA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GRACE PHYL

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

1/21/2020: Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

1/3/2020: Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

1/3/2020: Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

Summons - Summons on Complaint

11/8/2019: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

11/8/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint - Complaint

11/8/2019: Complaint - Complaint

First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

11/8/2019: First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

11/8/2019: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/27/2020
  • DocketAddress for Phyl Grace (Attorney) updated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • DocketUpdated -- Phyl Grace (Attorney): Organization Name: Center For Disability Access

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 05/07/2021 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 01/27/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 11/14/2022 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 01/27/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by NEHEMIAH KONG on 11/08/2019, entered Request for Dismissal without prejudice filed by NEHEMIAH KONG as to the entire action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by: NEHEMIAH KONG (Plaintiff); As to: ANGELA CONTOS (Defendant); GOLDEN STAR FAMILY RESTAURANTS, INC., a Califirnia corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: NEHEMIAH KONG (Plaintiff); As to: GOLDEN STAR FAMILY RESTAURANTS, INC., a Califirnia corporation (Defendant); Service Date: 12/03/2019; Service Cost: 30.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: NEHEMIAH KONG (Plaintiff); As to: ANGELA CONTOS (Defendant); Service Date: 12/05/2019; Service Cost: 30.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2019
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 05/07/2021 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2019
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 11/14/2022 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2019
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Serena R. Murillo in Department 94 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: NEHEMIAH KONG (Plaintiff); As to: ANGELA CONTOS (Defendant); GOLDEN STAR FAMILY RESTAURANTS, INC., a Califirnia corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: NEHEMIAH KONG (Plaintiff); As to: ANGELA CONTOS (Defendant); GOLDEN STAR FAMILY RESTAURANTS, INC., a Califirnia corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2019
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: NEHEMIAH KONG (Plaintiff); As to: ANGELA CONTOS (Defendant); GOLDEN STAR FAMILY RESTAURANTS, INC., a Califirnia corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2019
  • DocketFirst Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer GRACE PHYL