This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 02/08/2019 at 20:17:46 (UTC).

NAVIN DOSHI, ET AL. VS GILBERT ORTEGA

Case Summary

On 03/29/2018 NAVIN DOSHI filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against GILBERT ORTEGA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Inglewood Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is RONALD F. FRANK. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0223

  • Filing Date:

    03/29/2018

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Courthouse:

    Inglewood Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

RONALD F. FRANK

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

DOSHI NAVIN

DOSHI PRATIMA

Defendant

ORTEGA GILBERT

Hawthorne, CA 90250

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CHANA HARMEET KAUR

Attorney at Chana Law Firm

810 E Commonwealth Ave,

Fullerton, CA 92831

 

Court Documents

Answer

4/4/2018: Answer

Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

4/4/2018: Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

Summons - on Complaint

3/29/2018: Summons - on Complaint

Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - (ALL OCCUPANTS)

3/29/2018: Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - (ALL OCCUPANTS)

Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - (Gilbert Ortega)

3/29/2018: Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - (Gilbert Ortega)

Property Owner/Landlord Notice of Hearing Re Failure to File Proof of Service

3/29/2018: Property Owner/Landlord Notice of Hearing Re Failure to File Proof of Service

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

3/29/2018: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Writ of - Possession

5/11/2018: Writ of - Possession

Application for Writ of Possession

5/11/2018: Application for Writ of Possession

Certificate of Mailing for - Minute Order (Ex-Parte Proceeding) of 05/10/2018

5/10/2018: Certificate of Mailing for - Minute Order (Ex-Parte Proceeding) of 05/10/2018

Minute Order - (Ex-Parte Proceeding For Order Staying Writ)

5/7/2018: Minute Order - (Ex-Parte Proceeding For Order Staying Writ)

Ex Parte Application - For Order Staying Execution

5/7/2018: Ex Parte Application - For Order Staying Execution

Judgment Unlawful Detainer

5/2/2018: Judgment Unlawful Detainer

Notice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order

5/2/2018: Notice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order

Certificate of Mailing for - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 05/02/2018

5/2/2018: Certificate of Mailing for - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 05/02/2018

Proof of Personal Service

4/25/2018: Proof of Personal Service

Request/Counter-Request To Set Case For Trial

4/12/2018: Request/Counter-Request To Set Case For Trial

Notice of Unlawful Detainer Trial

4/17/2018: Notice of Unlawful Detainer Trial

15 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/11/2018
  • Application for Writ of Possession; Filed by: Navin Doshi (Plaintiff); Pratima Doshi (Plaintiff); Daily Rental Value: 21.33

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2018
  • Writ of Possession; Filed by: Navin Doshi (Plaintiff); Pratima Doshi (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2018
  • Ex Parte Application Order Staying Execution of Judgment, etc. Filed by: Gilbert Ortega (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2018
  • Ex-parte Ex-Parte Proceeding scheduled for 05/10/2018 at 01:30 PM in Inglewood Courthouse at Department 8

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2018
  • Minute Order (Ex-Parte Proceeding)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2018
  • Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Ex-Parte Proceeding) of 05/10/2018; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2018
  • Updated -- Ex Parte Application Order Staying Execution of Judgment, etc.: Result: Granted; Result Date: 05/10/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2018
  • Ex-parte Ex-Parte Proceeding scheduled for 05/10/2018 at 01:30 PM in Inglewood Courthouse at Department 8 updated: Result Date to 05/10/2018; Result Type to Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2018
  • Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Navin Doshi (Plaintiff); Pratima Doshi (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2018
  • Ex Parte Application For Order Staying Execution; Filed by: Gilbert Ortega (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
22 More Docket Entries
  • 04/04/2018
  • Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Signed and Filed by: Clerk; As to: Gilbert Ortega (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2018
  • Answer; Filed by: Gilbert Ortega (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2018
  • Complaint; Filed by: Navin Doshi (Plaintiff); Pratima Doshi (Plaintiff); As to: Gilbert Ortega (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2018
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Navin Doshi (Plaintiff); Pratima Doshi (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2018
  • Summons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2018
  • Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2018
  • Property Owner/Landlord Only Hearing Notice; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2018
  • Case assigned to Hon. Ronald F. Frank in Department 8 Inglewood Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2018
  • Order to Show Cause - Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 06/11/2018 at 08:30 AM in Inglewood Courthouse at Civil Clerk's Office

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2018
  • Notice of Unlawful Detainer mailed 04/02/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer CHANA LAW FIRM - HARMEET K CHANA