This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/12/2021 at 03:00:15 (UTC).

NAVARRO, ANTHONY VS CAFE CANCUN MEXICAN FOOD

Case Summary

On 10/18/2016 NAVARRO, ANTHONY filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against CAFE CANCUN MEXICAN FOOD. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****2835

  • Filing Date:

    10/18/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

NAVARRO ANTHONY

Defendants

SMITRAY INC

CAFE CANCUN MEXICAN FOOD

VIVEROS JORGE

VIVEROS AURELIA

FOOD CAFE CANCUN MEXICAN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

BOARDWALK LAW FIRM

FIRM BOARDWALK LAW

 

Court Documents

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

9/25/2017: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Notice of Rejection - Application for Default Judgment by Court - Contract or Tort

10/11/2017: Notice of Rejection - Application for Default Judgment by Court - Contract or Tort

Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

4/18/2018: Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

4/18/2018: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Judgment

5/16/2018: Judgment

Declaration (name extension) - 585

5/16/2018: Declaration (name extension) - 585

Declaration (name extension) - 585

5/16/2018: Declaration (name extension) - 585

Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment

5/16/2018: Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/21/2018
  • DocketUpdated -- Non-Jury Trial: Location changed from Department 77 to Department 94

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2018
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause re: Entry of Default and Default Judgment/Dismissal scheduled for 06/19/2018 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 05/21/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2018
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 10/18/2019 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 05/21/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2018
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by: ANTHONY NAVARRO (Plaintiff); As to: Does: 1-10 JORGE VIVEROS (Defendant); AURELIA VIVEROS (Defendant); SMITRAY INC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2018
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by NAVARRO, ANTHONY on 10/18/2016, Request for dismissal With Prejudice entered as to SMITRAY INC; AURELIA VIVEROS; JORGE VIVEROS, Does 1-10

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2018
  • DocketJudgment; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2018
  • DocketDefault judgment entered for Plaintiff NAVARRO, ANTHONY against Defendant CAFE CANCUN MEXICAN FOOD on the Complaint filed by NAVARRO, ANTHONY on 10/18/2016 for damages of $5,000.00, attorney fees of $800.00, and costs of $370.00 for a total of $6,170.00.; Other: See attached.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2018
  • DocketDeclaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment; Filed by: ANTHONY NAVARRO (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2018
  • DocketDeclaration 585; Filed by: ANTHONY NAVARRO (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2018
  • DocketDeclaration 585; Filed by: ANTHONY NAVARRO (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
18 More Docket Entries
  • 12/28/2016
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE TO COMPLAINT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2016
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE TO COMPLAINT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2016
  • DocketNON-JURY TRIAL SET FOR 04/18/18, 08:30 AM, DEPT 77

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2016
  • DocketOSC SET 10/18/19, 08:30 AM, DEPT. 77 PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2016
  • DocketA/C - COMPLAINT FILED REASON: COURT ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2016
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED - CIVIL RIGHTS/DISCRIMINIATION FILED Filing Fee: 370.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2016
  • DocketSUMMONS FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2016
  • DocketFEE WAIVER FILED -CASE FILING FEE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2016
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Filed by: Clerk; As to: ANTHONY NAVARRO (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2016
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: ANTHONY NAVARRO (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SMITRAY INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant