This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/13/2020 at 16:03:23 (UTC).

NATIONWIDE REGULATORY COMPLIANCE LLC., A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY VS ROK MOBILE INC., A CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 03/25/2020 NATIONWIDE REGULATORY COMPLIANCE LLC , A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against ROK MOBILE INC , A CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Chatsworth Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is GRACIELA FREIXES. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1628

  • Filing Date:

    03/25/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

GRACIELA FREIXES

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

NATIONWIDE REGULATORY COMPLIANCE LLC. A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Defendant

ROK MOBILE INC. A CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ANKER JACQUELINE

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

6/2/2020: Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

Declaration of Interest, Costs and Attorney Fees - Declaration of Interest, Costs and Attorney Fees

6/2/2020: Declaration of Interest, Costs and Attorney Fees - Declaration of Interest, Costs and Attorney Fees

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

6/2/2020: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment - Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment

6/2/2020: Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment - Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment

Default Judgment - Default Judgment

6/4/2020: Default Judgment - Default Judgment

Writ of Execution - Writ of Execution (LOS ANGELES)

6/15/2020: Writ of Execution - Writ of Execution (LOS ANGELES)

Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

5/7/2020: Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

Complaint - Complaint

3/25/2020: Complaint - Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

3/25/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - Summons on Complaint

3/25/2020: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

3/25/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) - Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

3/25/2020: Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) - Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/15/2020
  • DocketWrit of Execution (LOS ANGELES); Issued by: Nationwide Regulatory Compliance LLC., a Limited Liability Company (Plaintiff); As to: Rok Mobile Inc., a Corporation (Defendant); County: LOS ANGELES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 scheduled for 04/01/2021 at 08:30 AM in Chatsworth Courthouse at Department F43 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 06/05/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2020
  • DocketDefault judgment by Court entered for Plaintiff Nationwide Regulatory Compliance LLC., a Limited Liability Company against Defendant Rok Mobile Inc., a Corporation on the Complaint filed by Nationwide Regulatory Compliance LLC., a Limited Liability Company on 03/25/2020 for the principal amount of $21,971.47, attorney fees of $1,200.00, interest of $1,306.25, and costs of $455.50 for a total of $24,933.22.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2020
  • DocketUpdated -- Default Judgment: Status Date changed from 06/04/2020 to 06/04/2020; Result Date changed from 06/04/2020 to 06/04/2020; As To Parties changed from Rok Mobile Inc., a Corporation (Defendant) to Rok Mobile Inc., a Corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2020
  • DocketUpdated -- Default Judgment: Filed By: Nationwide Regulatory Compliance LLC., a Limited Liability Company (Plaintiff); Result: Granted; Result Date: 06/04/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2020
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by: Nationwide Regulatory Compliance LLC., a Limited Liability Company (Plaintiff); As to: Rok Mobile Inc., a Corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2020
  • DocketDeclaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment; Filed by: Nationwide Regulatory Compliance LLC., a Limited Liability Company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2020
  • DocketDeclaration of Interest, Costs and Attorney Fees; Filed by: Nationwide Regulatory Compliance LLC., a Limited Liability Company (Plaintiff); As to: Rok Mobile Inc., a Corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2020
  • DocketDefault entered as to Rok Mobile Inc., a Corporation; On the Complaint filed by Nationwide Regulatory Compliance LLC., a Limited Liability Company on 03/25/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2020
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by Nationwide Regulatory Compliance LLC., a Limited Liability Company on 03/25/2020, entered Request for Dismissal without prejudice filed by Nationwide Regulatory Compliance LLC., a Limited Liability Company, does 1-10

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 05/07/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Nationwide Regulatory Compliance LLC., a Limited Liability Company (Plaintiff); As to: Rok Mobile Inc., a Corporation (Defendant); Service Date: 04/24/2020; Service Cost: 55.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2020
  • DocketUpdated -- Complaint: As To Parties changed from Rok Mobile Inc., a Corporation (Defendant) to Rok Mobile Inc., a Corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 scheduled for 04/01/2021 at 08:30 AM in Chatsworth Courthouse at Department F43

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2020
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Collections Case (CCP 3.740)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Nationwide Regulatory Compliance LLC., a Limited Liability Company (Plaintiff); As to: Rok Mobile Inc., a Corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Nationwide Regulatory Compliance LLC., a Limited Liability Company (Plaintiff); As to: Rok Mobile Inc., a Corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2020
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Nationwide Regulatory Compliance LLC., a Limited Liability Company (Plaintiff); As to: Rok Mobile Inc., a Corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Graciela Freixes in Department F43 Chatsworth Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ROK MOBILE INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ANKER, JACQUELINE N