This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/23/2021 at 11:12:33 (UTC).

NATIONWIDE INSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICA VS JAMES PETERSEN INDUSTRIES, INC., ET AL.

Case Summary

On 12/01/2020 NATIONWIDE INSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICA filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against JAMES PETERSEN INDUSTRIES, INC . This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is SERENA R. MURILLO. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******9988

  • Filing Date:

    12/01/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

SERENA R. MURILLO

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

NATIONWIDE INSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICA

Defendants

JAMES PETERSEN INDUSTRIES INC. DBA SOLAR 4 AMERICA

GUERRA FILIBERTO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BENSON SUSAN M

Defendant Attorney

MENDOZA GARRET-MITCHEL P.

 

Court Documents

Answer - Answer

2/25/2021: Answer - Answer

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

12/18/2020: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

12/9/2020: Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

Complaint - Complaint

12/1/2020: Complaint - Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

12/1/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - Summons on Complaint

12/1/2020: Summons - Summons on Complaint

First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

12/1/2020: First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

12/1/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/05/2023
  • Hearing12/05/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 26 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2022
  • Hearing05/31/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 26 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: James Petersen Industries, Inc. (Defendant); Filiberto Guerra (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2020
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Nationwide Insurance Company of America (Plaintiff); As to: Filiberto Guerra (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 12/11/2020; Service Cost: 65.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2020
  • DocketUpdated -- SUSAN M BENSON (Attorney): Organization Name changed from BENSON LEGAL, APC to Benson Legal, APC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2020
  • DocketAddress for SUSAN M BENSON (Attorney) null

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2020
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by Nationwide Insurance Company of America on 12/01/2020, entered Request for Dismissal without prejudice filed by Nationwide Insurance Company of America as to James Petersen Industries, Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2020
  • DocketFirst Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Nationwide Insurance Company of America (Plaintiff); As to: James Petersen Industries, Inc. (Defendant); Filiberto Guerra (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2020
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Nationwide Insurance Company of America (Plaintiff); As to: James Petersen Industries, Inc. (Defendant); Filiberto Guerra (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Nationwide Insurance Company of America (Plaintiff); As to: James Petersen Industries, Inc. (Defendant); Filiberto Guerra (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 12/05/2023 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2020
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 05/31/2022 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Serena R. Murillo in Department 26 Spring Street Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where JAMES PETERSEN INDUSTRIES INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where Nationwide Insurance Company of America is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MENDOZA GARRET-MITCHEL