This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/05/2021 at 02:25:40 (UTC).

NATIONAL DEFAULT SERVICING CORPORATION VS ALL CLAIMANTS TO SURPLUS FUNDS AFTER TRUSTEES SALE OF REAL PROPERTY LOCATED AT: 1747 WEST 168TH STREET, GARDENA, CA 90247

Case Summary

On 08/20/2020 NATIONAL DEFAULT SERVICING CORPORATION filed an Other lawsuit against ALL CLAIMANTS TO SURPLUS FUNDS AFTER TRUSTEES SALE OF REAL PROPERTY LOCATED AT 1747 WEST 168TH STREET, GARDENA, CA 90247. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is JAMES E. BLANCARTE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2656

  • Filing Date:

    08/20/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

JAMES E. BLANCARTE

 

Party Details

Petitioner

NATIONAL DEFAULT SERVICING CORPORATION

Respondent

ALL CLAIMANTS TO SURPLUS FUNDS AFTER TRUSTEES SALE OF REAL PROPERTY LOCATED AT: 1747 WEST 168TH STREET GARDENA CA 90247

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

ZAHRADKA ROBERT

 

Court Documents

Notice (name extension) - Notice of Petition of Trustee, National Default Servicing Corporation to Deposit Surplus Funds Pursuant to Civil Code Sec 2924j(c)&(d)

2/9/2021: Notice (name extension) - Notice of Petition of Trustee, National Default Servicing Corporation to Deposit Surplus Funds Pursuant to Civil Code Sec 2924j(c)&(d)

Declaration (name extension) - Declaration of Robert P. Zahradka, Esq. in Support of Petition to Deposit Undistributed Surplus Proceeds of Trustee's Sale

2/10/2021: Declaration (name extension) - Declaration of Robert P. Zahradka, Esq. in Support of Petition to Deposit Undistributed Surplus Proceeds of Trustee's Sale

Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Petition Petition and Declaration Regarding Unreso...)

3/3/2021: Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Petition Petition and Declaration Regarding Unreso...)

Proof of Service by Mail - Proof of Service by Mail CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE

3/5/2021: Proof of Service by Mail - Proof of Service by Mail CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE

Notice (name extension) - Notice of Hearing on Claims to the Undistributed Surplus Funds

3/5/2021: Notice (name extension) - Notice of Hearing on Claims to the Undistributed Surplus Funds

Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing - Other on Claims to the Undistributed Surplus Funds)

5/3/2021: Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing - Other on Claims to the Undistributed Surplus Funds)

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Hearing - Other on Claims to the Undistributed Surplus Funds) of 05/03/2021

5/3/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Hearing - Other on Claims to the Undistributed Surplus Funds) of 05/03/2021

Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Petition Petition and Declaration Regarding Unreso...)

1/25/2021: Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Petition Petition and Declaration Regarding Unreso...)

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order - Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

12/9/2020: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order - Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

8/20/2020: First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

Notice (name extension) - Notice OF PETITION OF TRUSTEE, NATIONAL DEFAULT SERVICING CORPORATION TO DEPOSIT SURPLUS FUNDS PURSUANT TO CIVIL CODE 2924j(c)&(d)

8/20/2020: Notice (name extension) - Notice OF PETITION OF TRUSTEE, NATIONAL DEFAULT SERVICING CORPORATION TO DEPOSIT SURPLUS FUNDS PURSUANT TO CIVIL CODE 2924j(c)&(d)

Petition and Declaration Regarding Unresolved Claims and Deposit of Undistributed Surplus Proceeds - Petition and Declaration Regarding Unresolved Claims and Deposit of Undistributed Surplus Proceeds

8/20/2020: Petition and Declaration Regarding Unresolved Claims and Deposit of Undistributed Surplus Proceeds - Petition and Declaration Regarding Unresolved Claims and Deposit of Undistributed Surplus Proceeds

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

8/20/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

8/20/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Notice of Hearing on Petition - Notice of Hearing on Petition

8/20/2020: Notice of Hearing on Petition - Notice of Hearing on Petition

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/05/2021
  • DocketNotice of Hearing on Claims to the Undistributed Surplus Funds; Filed by: NATIONAL DEFAULT SERVICING CORPORATION (Petitioner); As to: ALL CLAIMANTS TO SURPLUS FUNDS AFTER TRUSTEES SALE OF REAL PROPERTY LOCATED AT: 1747 WEST 168TH STREET, GARDENA, CA 90247 (Respondent)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE; Filed by: NATIONAL DEFAULT SERVICING CORPORATION (Petitioner); As to: ALL CLAIMANTS TO SURPLUS FUNDS AFTER TRUSTEES SALE OF REAL PROPERTY LOCATED AT: 1747 WEST 168TH STREET, GARDENA, CA 90247 (Respondent)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • DocketHearing - Other on Claims to the Undistributed Surplus Funds scheduled for 05/03/2021 at 10:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • DocketMinute Order (Hearing on Petition Petition and Declaration Regarding Unreso...)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • DocketHearing on Petition Petition and Declaration Regarding Unresolved Claims and Deposit of Undistributed Surplus Proceeds of Trustee's Sale scheduled for 03/03/2021 at 10:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25 updated: Result Date to 03/03/2021; Result Type to Held - Motion Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2021
  • DocketDeclaration of Robert P. Zahradka, Esq. in Support of Petition to Deposit Undistributed Surplus Proceeds of Trustee's Sale; Filed by: NATIONAL DEFAULT SERVICING CORPORATION (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • DocketNotice of Petition of Trustee, National Default Servicing Corporation to Deposit Surplus Funds Pursuant to Civil Code Sec 2924j(c)&(d); Filed by: NATIONAL DEFAULT SERVICING CORPORATION (Petitioner); As to: ALL CLAIMANTS TO SURPLUS FUNDS AFTER TRUSTEES SALE OF REAL PROPERTY LOCATED AT: 1747 WEST 168TH STREET, GARDENA, CA 90247 (Respondent)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2021
  • DocketMinute Order (Hearing on Petition Petition and Declaration Regarding Unreso...)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2021
  • DocketOn the Court's own motion, Hearing on Petition Petition and Declaration Regarding Unresolved Claims and Deposit of Undistributed Surplus Proceeds of Trustee's Sale scheduled for 01/25/2021 at 10:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25 Held - Continued was rescheduled to 03/03/2021 10:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2020
  • DocketThere being no judge available this date, Hearing on Petition Petition and Declaration Regarding Unresolved Claims and Deposit of Undistributed Surplus Proceeds of Trustee's Sale scheduled for 12/24/2020 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25 Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court was rescheduled to 01/25/2021 10:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2020
  • DocketNotice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2020
  • DocketPetition and Declaration Regarding Unresolved Claims and Deposit of Undistributed Surplus Proceeds of Trustee's Sale; Filed by: NATIONAL DEFAULT SERVICING CORPORATION (Petitioner); As to: ALL CLAIMANTS TO SURPLUS FUNDS AFTER TRUSTEES SALE OF REAL PROPERTY LOCATED AT: 1747 WEST 168TH STREET, GARDENA, CA 90247 (Respondent)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2020
  • DocketNotice OF PETITION OF TRUSTEE, NATIONAL DEFAULT SERVICING CORPORATION TO DEPOSIT SURPLUS FUNDS PURSUANT TO CIVIL CODE 2924j(c)&(d); Filed by: NATIONAL DEFAULT SERVICING CORPORATION (Petitioner); As to: ALL CLAIMANTS TO SURPLUS FUNDS AFTER TRUSTEES SALE OF REAL PROPERTY LOCATED AT: 1747 WEST 168TH STREET, GARDENA, CA 90247 (Respondent)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: NATIONAL DEFAULT SERVICING CORPORATION (Petitioner); As to: ALL CLAIMANTS TO SURPLUS FUNDS AFTER TRUSTEES SALE OF REAL PROPERTY LOCATED AT: 1747 WEST 168TH STREET, GARDENA, CA 90247 (Respondent)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2020
  • DocketNotice of Hearing on Petition; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2020
  • DocketFirst Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2020
  • DocketHearing on Petition Petition and Declaration Regarding Unresolved Claims and Deposit of Undistributed Surplus Proceeds of Trustee's Sale scheduled for 12/24/2020 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. James E. Blancarte in Department 25 Spring Street Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: 20STCP02656    Hearing Date: June 7, 2021    Dept: 25

PROCEEDINGS: HEARING ON CLAIMS TO THE UNDISTRIBUTED SURPLUS FUNDS

MOVING PARTY: None

RESP. PARTY: None

HEARING ON DISBURSEMENT OF FUNDS

(Civ. Code § 2924j(b)-(c))

TENTATIVE RULING:

Because no claims to the funds have been filed, the Hearing on Claims to the Undistributed Surplus Funds is PLACED OFF CALENDAR.

The Court sets an OSC re: Escheating Funds for JUNE 10, 2024 at 9:30 a.m. in Department 25 at the SPRING STREET COURTHOUSE.

OPPOSITION: None filed as of June 3, 2021 [ ] Late [X] None

REPLY: None filed as of June 3, 2021 [ ] Late [X] None

ANALYSIS:

I. Background & Discussion

On August 20, 2020, Petitioner National Default Servicing Corporation (“Petitioner”) filed the instant Petition and Declaration Regarding Unresolved Claims and Deposit of Undistributed Surplus Proceeds of Trustee’s Sale (the “Petition”).

On March 3, 2021, the Court granted the Petition effective upon Petitioner’s compliance with the following. (3/3/21 Minute Order.) Petitioner was ordered to deposit surplus funds of $5,469.71 with the Court within thirty days of the order. (Id.) Petitioner was also ordered to give all potential claimants notice of the Hearing on Claims to the Undistributed Surplus Funds set for May 3, 2021 at 10:00 a.m. (Id.) The Court warned that if no claims or appearances were made, the matter would be set for an OSC re: Escheating Funds. (Id.)

Petitioner filed a notice regarding the May 3 hearing with a proof of service demonstrating the potential claimants were served via regular mail on March 5, 2021. (3/5/21 Notice & Proof of Service.) On March 29, Petitioner also deposited with the Court surplus funds of $5,469.71.

An initial hearing on claims to the undistributed funds was scheduled for May 3, 2021. Self-represented non-party claimant Carlos Montoya appeared at the hearing. (5/3/21 Minute Order.) The Court continued the matter and ordered all claimants to file a written claim within thirty (30) days of that hearing. (Id.) The Court again warned that if no written claims or appearances were made, the matter would be set for an OSC re: Escheating Funds. (Id.)

No claims have been filed to date. Accordingly, the Hearing on Claims to the Undistributed Funds is PLACED OFF CALENDAR.

II. Conclusion & Order

Because no claims to the funds have been filed, the Hearing on Claims to the Undistributed Surplus Funds is PLACED OFF CALENDAR.

The Court sets an OSC re: Escheating Funds for JUNE 10, 2024 at 9:30 a.m. in Department 25 at the SPRING STREET COURTHOUSE.

Case Number: 20STCP02656     Hearing Date: May 3, 2021    Dept: 25

PROCEEDINGS: HEARING ON CLAIMS TO THE UNDISTRIBUTED SURPLUS FUNDS

MOVING PARTY: None

RESP. PARTY: None

HEARING ON DISBURSEMENT OF FUNDS

(Civ. Code § 2924j(b)-(c))

TENTATIVE RULING:

Because no claims to the funds have been filed, the Hearing on Claims to the Undistributed Surplus Funds is PLACED OFF CALENDAR.

The Court sets an OSC re: Escheating Funds for June 7, 2021 at 10:30 a.m. in Department 25 at the SPRING STREET COURTHOUSE.

OPPOSITION: None filed as of April 30, 2021 [ ] Late [X] None

REPLY: None filed as of April 30, 2021 [ ] Late [X] None

ANALYSIS:

I. Background & Discussion

On August 20, 2020, Petitioner National Default Servicing Corporation (“Petitioner”) filed the instant Petition and Declaration Regarding Unresolved Claims and Deposit of Undistributed Surplus Proceeds of Trustee’s Sale (the “Petition”).

On March 3, 2021, the Court granted the Petition effective upon Petitioner’s compliance with the following. (3/3/21 Minute Order.) Petitioner was ordered to deposit surplus funds of $5,469.71 with the Court within thirty days of the order. (Id.) Petitioner was also ordered to give all potential claimants notice of the Hearing on Claims to the Undistributed Surplus Funds set for May 3, 2021 at 10:00 a.m. (Id.) The Court warned that if no claims or appearances are made, the matter would be set for an OSC re: Escheating Funds. (Id.)

Petitioner filed a notice regarding the May 3 hearing with a proof of service demonstrating the potential claimants were served via regular mail on March 5, 2021. (3/5/21 Notice & Proof of Service.) On March 29, Petitioner also deposited with the Court surplus funds of $5,469.71.

No claims have been filed to date. Accordingly, the Hearing on Claims to the Undistributed Funds is PLACED OFF CALENDAR.

II. Conclusion & Order

Because no claims to the funds have been filed, the Hearing on Claims to the Undistributed Surplus Funds is PLACED OFF CALENDAR.

The Court sets an OSC re: Escheating Funds for June 7, 2021 at 10:30 a.m. in Department 25 at the SPRING STREET COURTHOUSE.

Case Number: 20STCP02656    Hearing Date: March 03, 2021    Dept: 25


Case Number: 20STCP03752    Hearing Date: March 03, 2021    Dept: 25

HEARING DATE:    Wed., March 3, 2021 JUDGE /DEPT: Blancarte/25

CASE NAME: Merle’s Manor II, LLC v. Ramirez, et al. PET. FILED: 11-12-20

CASE NUMBER: 20STCP03752 

NOTICE: OK

PROCEEDINGS    PETITION FOR PERMANENT INJUNCTION PURSUANT TO CIVIL CODE SECTION 798.88

MOVING PARTY:   Petitioner Merle’s Manor II, LLC

RESP. PARTY: Respondents Jose Ramirez and Guadalupe Ramirez  

PERMANENT INJUNCTION

(Civil Code § 798.88)

TENTATIVE RULING:

Petitioner Merle’s Manor II, LLC’s Petition for Permanent Injunction Pursuant to Civil Code section 798.88 is CONTINUED TO MAY 3, 2021 at 10:00 a.m. in Department 25 at the SPRINT STREET COURTHOUSE. At least 16 court days before the next scheduled hearing Respondents must file and serve supplemental papers, including documentary evidence, as requested herein.

SERVICE

[X] Proof of Service Timely Filed (CRC, rule 3.1300) OK

[X] Correct Address (CCP §§ 1013, 1013a) OK

[X] 16/21 Court Days Lapsed (CCP §§ 12c, 1005(b)) OK

OPPOSITION: None filed as of January 12, 2021 [   ] Late [X] None

REPLY: None filed as of January 12, 2021 [   ] Late [X] None

PET. SUPP. PAPERS: Filed on February 9, 2021 [   ] Late [X] None

RESP. SUPP. PAPERS: Filed on March 1, 2021 [   ] Late [X] None

ANALYSIS:

  1. Background

Petitioner Merle’s Manor II, LLC (“Petitioner”) filed the instant Petition for Permanent Injunction Pursuant to Civil Code section 798.88 (the “Petition”) against Respondents Jose Ramirez (“Jose”) and Guadalupe Ramirez (“Guadalupe”) (collectively, “Respondents”) on November 12, 2020. Petitioner moves pursuant to Civil Code section 798.88 for an order enjoining Respondents from continuing violations of the rules of Petitioner’s mobilehome park located at 1000 N. Figueroa St., Wilmington, CA 90744 (the “Mobilehome Park”). (Pet., pp. 7-8, ¶¶ 2, 14-16.) Respondents’ mobilehome occupies Space No. 2 in Defendant’s Mobilehome Park (the “Premises”). (Id. at ¶ 2.) Petitioner requests that Respondents be immediately ordered to (1) remove all items outside their mobilehome and storage shed except outdoor patio furniture and barbecues and be prohibited from storing any items except outdoor patio furniture and barbecues outside the mobilehome; (2) remove two unapproved, unregistered dogs; (3) trim the overgrown trees and bushes; (4) repair and/or replace the damaged skirting on the mobilehome; and (5) paint the storage shed in a color that matches Respondents’ mobilehome. (Pet., Prayer, ¶ 1.) Respondents did not file an opposition.

Both Petitioner and self-represented Respondents appeared at the initial January 14, 2021 hearing. (1/14/21 Minute Order.) Respondents required a Spanish interpreter. (Id.) After fully considering the parties’ oral arguments, the Court did not adopt its tentative ruling, continued the hearing, and ordered the parties to meet and confer on a possible good faith settlement of the case no later than January 28, 2021. (Id.)

Petitioner filed supplemental papers on February 9. Respondents filed a substitution of attorney form, indicating they are now being represented by attorney Martin Kovlasky on March 1. (3/1/21 Substitution of Attorney.) That same day, Respondents filed a reply to Petitioner’s supplemental papers.

  1. Legal Standard

The Mobilehome Residency Law (“MRL”) gives management an injunctive relief remedy for violations of “reasonable” park rules and regulations. (Civ. Code, § 798.88.) Specifically, management may obtain a restraining order against a continuing or recurring violation of any “reasonable rule or regulation.” (Civ. Code, § 798.88, subd. (b); Rancho Santa Paula Mobilehome Park, Ltd. v. Evans (1994) 26 Cal.App.4th 1139, 1142.) At the time of the hearing, the court shall issue the injunction if it finds by clear and convincing evidence the existence of a continuing or recurring violation of a “reasonable rule or regulation.” (Civ. Code, § 798.88, subd. (d).) The duration of the injunction may not exceed three years. (Civ. Code, § 798.88, subd. (d).)

  1. Discussion

Petitioner personally served Respondents with the Petition on December 3, 2020. (12/8/20 Proofs of Service.)

The Petition is supported by the declarations of Trish Simpson (“Simpson”), the regional manager of the Mobilehome Park, and Mario Flores (“Flores”), the resident manager of the Mobilehome Park. Simpson states in her declaration that Petitioner is the owner of the Mobilehome Park and that Respondents entered into a written lease agreement with the Petitioner on or about October 14, 1999. (Mot., Simpson Decl., ¶ 2.) Thereafter, on or about March 15, 2020, Respondents entered into an updated lease agreement requiring, in pertinent part, that Respondents comply with all of the Mobilehome Park’s Rules and Regulations (the “Rules”). (Id., Exh. 1.) The Rules were incorporated into the new lease agreement signed on March 15, 2020. (Id.)

Petitioner’s moving papers stated the following: Prior to August 18, 2020, Flores observed Respondents violating several Mobilehome Park Rules as follows:  (1) by having two unregistered dogs, tying them up outside and leaving them unattended, allowing them to roam the Mobilehome Park without a leash, and failing to clean up their feces; (2) by having numerous items stored outside of their mobilehome and failing to maintain the mobilehome landscaping; (3) by having damaged skirting on their mobilehome, overgrown trees and weeds; and (4) by failing to paint their storage shed in a color that matched Respondents’ mobilehome. (Mot., Flores Decl., ¶ 4.) Following these violations, on August 18, 2020, Simpson issued a Seven-Day Notice to comply with the Rules.  (Id., Simpson Decl., ¶ 3, Exh. 3.) Respondents only partially complied with the first Seven-Day Notice. (Id., Flores Decl., ¶ 4(a).) On October 8, 2020, Petitioner’s counsel issued a second Seven-Day Notice for continuous violations of the Mobilehome Park Rules. (Id., Beam Decl., ¶ 2, Exh. 4.) Respondents were also given informal notices of their Rules violations prior to service of the Seven-Day Notices. (Id., Simpson Decl., ¶ 6; Flores Decl., ¶ 4.) Despite the Seven-Day Notices and informal notices, Respondents failed to cure their violations. (Id. Simpson Decl., ¶ 7.) The moving papers stated that, as of the date the Petition was filed, Respondents (1) had not removed all impermissibly stored items from the Premises, (2) continued to allow their two dogs to roam free in the Mobilehome Park; (3) had not painted the storage shed in a color that matched their mobilehome; (4) had failed to maintain the landscaping; and (5) had not fixed the damaged skirting on their mobilehome. (Id.; Flores Decl., ¶ 6.)

In its supplemental papers, Petitioner provides details regarding the parties’ meet and confer efforts. (2/9/21 Pet. Supp. Brief, p. 2:6-19.) Petitioner states that Respondents made no effort to contact Petitioner’s counsel, so on January 28, 2021, Petitioner’s counsel called Respondent Jose. (Id.) Petitioner states counsel and Respondent Jose initially discussed the matter without an interpreter but when counsel stated that any settlement would have to include attorney’s fees, Respondent Jose became “combative” and demanded an in-person meeting with an interpreter present. (Id.) Petitioner also states that on January 29, 2021, Respondent Jose stated he wanted to go back to Court. (Id.) Additionally, Petitioner provides evidence that, as of January 25, 2021, Defendant continued to violate Park Rules by continuing to impermissibly store unapproved items outside their mobilehome and shed, failing to register pets, and failing to repair damaged skirting. (Id., pp. 4:25-5:3, Flores Decl., ¶ 7, Exh. A.) Petitioner also notes several violations not previously raised, including Respondents’ unapproved gate and outdoor pizza oven. (Id.)

In Respondents’ reply brief, they argue they were never provided a copy of the Park Rules in Spanish even though they are Spanish speakers and that they were not given adequate notice of the violations Petitioner complains of in light of their language barrier. (Resp. Reply, p. 2:2-19.) However, Respondents do not include any evidence, such as a declaration from Respondents themselves, attesting to this. Respondents also argue that Petitioner’s counsel did not meet and confer in good faith because Petitioner’s counsel called Respondent Jose without a Spanish interpreter and because the settlement amount offered was unreasonable. (Id. at pp. 3:18-4:2.) As to the pizza oven raised for the first time in Petitioner’s supplemental papers, Respondents argue that Flores gave Respondents express permission to install it and further argue the “unapproved” gate was approved and installed in 2003. (Id. at p. 4:2-8.) However, Respondents do not present any evidence regarding Petitioner’s permission for the pizza oven or gate.

Lastly, without including any evidence, Respondents state that the alleged violations have now been cured. Specifically, Respondents state that the gate has been removed, that the dogs have been given away, that the skirting has been repaired and painted, and that the roof of the shed has been repaired and painted. (Id. at p. 12-24.) Notably, Respondents do not state or provide evidence that the other impermissibly stored items identified in Flores’ supplemental declaration, including bikes, weights and a weight bench, hose, ladder, containers, pieces of wood, trash, furniture, pieces of metal, and cinder blocks were also removed. (2/9/21 Pet. Supp. Brief, Flores Decl., ¶ 7.)

Because Respondents did not submit any evidence regarding Respondents’ lack of notice for these violations nor any evidence regarding Respondents’ cure of the violations identified in Petitioner’s moving and supplemental papers, the Court is unable to issue a ruling at this time. Respondents are ordered to file and serve supplemental papers, including documentary evidence, in support of the arguments made in their reply brief at least 16 court days before the next scheduled hearing.

  1. Conclusion & Order

For the foregoing reasons, Petitioner Merle’s Manor II, LLC’s Petition for Permanent Injunction Pursuant to Civil Code section 798.88 is CONTINUED TO MAY 3, 2021 at 10:00 a.m. in Department 25 at the SPRINT STREET COURTHOUSE. At least 16 court days before the next scheduled hearing Respondents must file and serve supplemental papers, including documentary evidence, as requested herein.

Moving party is ordered to give notice.

Case Number: 20STCP02656    Hearing Date: January 25, 2021    Dept: 25

HEARING DATE: Mon., January 25, 2021 JUDGE /DEPT: Blancarte/25

CASE NAME: National Default Servicing Corp. v. All Claimants to Surplus Funds

CASE NUMBER: 20STCP02656 PET. FILED: 08-20-20

NOTICE: OK

PROCEEDINGS: PETITION AND DECLARATION REGARDING UNRESOLVED CLAIMS AND DEPOSIT OF UNDISTRIBUTED SURPLUS PROCEEDS OF TRUSTEE’S SALE

MOVING PARTY: Petitioner National Default Servicing Corporation

RESP. PARTY: None

PETITION AND DECLARATION REGARDING UNRESOLVED CLAIMS AND DEPOSIT OF UNDISTRIBUTED SURPLUS PROCEEDS OF TRUSTEE’S SALE

(Civ. Code § 2924j(b)-(c))

TENTATIVE RULING:

The Petition and Declaration Regarding Unresolved Claims and Deposit of Undistributed Surplus Proceeds of Trustee’s sale is CONTINUED TO MARCH 3, 2021 AT 1`0:30 A.M. in Department 25 at the SPRING STREET COURTHOUSE. Petitioner is ordered to file and serve a corrected notice of intent to deposit on all potential claimants and interested parties at least 16 court days before the next hearing. Petitioner’s counsel is also ordered to submit a declaration regarding the basis for the attorney’s fees requested.

OPPOSITION: None filed as of January 21, 2021 [ ] Late [X] None

REPLY: None filed as of January 21, 2021 [ ] Late [X] None

ANALYSIS:

  1. Background & Discussion

On August 20, 2020, Petitioner National Default Servicing Corporation (“Petitioner”) filed the instant Petition and Declaration Regarding Unresolved Claims and Deposit of Undistributed Surplus Proceeds of Trustee’s Sale (the “Petition”).

Having reviewed the Petition, the Court finds that Petitioner has not complied with all notice and procedural requirements. Specifically, the notice of intent to deposit does not include the correct address and phone number of this Court. The notice was also not mailed to all claimants via first-class mail. Thus, the requirements of Civil Code section 2924j, subdivision (d) have not been met. Petitioner is ordered to file and serve a corrected notice of intent to deposit on all potential claimants and interested parties with a proof of service at least 16 court days before the next scheduled hearing.

In addition, Petitioner seeks attorney’s fees and costs of $3,524.67. (Pet., ¶ 15.) However, Petitioner’s counsel did not submit a declaration detailing their hourly rate or time spent on this matter. Thus, Petitioner’s counsel is ordered to provide this information before attorney’s fees may be considered.

  1. Conclusion & Order

For the foregoing reasons, the Petition and Declaration Regarding Unresolved Claims and Deposit of Undistributed Surplus Proceeds of Trustee’s sale is CONTINUED TO MARCH 3, 2021 AT 10:30 A.M. in Department 25 at the SPRING STREET COURTHOUSE. Petitioner is ordered to file and serve a corrected notice of intent to deposit on all potential claimants and interested parties at least 16 court days before the next hearing. Petitioner’s counsel is also ordered to submit a declaration regarding the basis for the attorney’s fees requested.

Moving party is ordered to give notice.

related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where NATIONAL DEFAULT SERVICING CORPORATIOIN is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ZAHRADKA ROBERT