This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/10/2022 at 16:12:20 (UTC).

NATIONAL CREDIT CONTROL AGENCY INC VS HENRY M LEE LAW CORPORATION, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 01/15/2019 NATIONAL CREDIT CONTROL AGENCY INC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against HENRY M LEE LAW CORPORATION,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Norwalk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is ANN H. PARK. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2115

  • Filing Date:

    01/15/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

ANN H. PARK

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

NATIONAL CREDIT CONTROL AGENCY INC

Defendants

HENRY M LEE LAW CORPORATION

LEE HENRY M

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LOVE FRANKLIN JAY

 

Court Documents

Writ - Return - Writ - Return PARTIAL

5/6/2020: Writ - Return - Writ - Return PARTIAL

Proof of Service - No Service - Proof of Service - No Service

6/7/2019: Proof of Service - No Service - Proof of Service - No Service

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

6/7/2019: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

6/7/2019: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Declaration (name extension) - Declaration DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF JUDGMENT

6/7/2019: Declaration (name extension) - Declaration DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF JUDGMENT

Proof of Service - No Service - Proof of Service - No Service

6/7/2019: Proof of Service - No Service - Proof of Service - No Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

6/7/2019: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Declaration (name extension) - Declaration DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF ATTORNEY FEES

6/7/2019: Declaration (name extension) - Declaration DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF ATTORNEY FEES

Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

6/7/2019: Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

Declaration (name extension) - Declaration COMPUTATION OF INTEREST

6/7/2019: Declaration (name extension) - Declaration COMPUTATION OF INTEREST

Judgment - Judgment JUDGMENT

8/6/2019: Judgment - Judgment JUDGMENT

Memorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest - Memorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest

9/4/2019: Memorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest - Memorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest

Writ of Execution - Writ of Execution (Los Angeles)

9/5/2019: Writ of Execution - Writ of Execution (Los Angeles)

Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) - Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

1/15/2019: Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) - Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

1/15/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

1/15/2019: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Complaint - Complaint

1/15/2019: Complaint - Complaint

Summons - Summons on Complaint

1/15/2019: Summons - Summons on Complaint

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/13/2020
  • DocketUpdated -- Writ - Return PARTIAL: As To Parties: removed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/06/2020
  • DocketWrit - Return PARTIAL ( ); Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/05/2019
  • DocketWrit of Execution (Los Angeles); Issued by: NATIONAL CREDIT CONTROL AGENCY INC (Plaintiff); As to: HENRY M LEE LAW CORPORATION (Defendant); HENRY M LEE (Defendant); County: Los Angeles; Principal: 30203.99; Interest: 99.30

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/04/2019
  • DocketMemorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest; Filed by: NATIONAL CREDIT CONTROL AGENCY INC (Plaintiff); Costs: 0.00; Interest: 99.30; Credits: 0.00; Service Date: 08/19/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/06/2019
  • DocketDefault judgment by Court entered for Plaintiff NATIONAL CREDIT CONTROL AGENCY INC against Defendant HENRY M LEE and Defendant HENRY M LEE LAW CORPORATION on the Complaint filed by NATIONAL CREDIT CONTROL AGENCY INC on 01/15/2019 for the principal amount of $24,985.00, attorney fees of $1,139.55, interest of $3,529.44, and costs of $550.00 for a total of $30,203.99.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/06/2019
  • DocketJudgment JUDGMENT; Filed by: NATIONAL CREDIT CONTROL AGENCY INC (Plaintiff); As to: HENRY M LEE LAW CORPORATION (Defendant); HENRY M LEE (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/06/2019
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 scheduled for 01/21/2020 at 08:30 AM in Norwalk Courthouse at Department A Not Held - Vacated by Court on 08/06/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/23/2019
  • DocketUpdated -- Judgment JUDGMENT: Filed By: NATIONAL CREDIT CONTROL AGENCY INC (Plaintiff); Result: Granted; Result Date: 07/23/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: NATIONAL CREDIT CONTROL AGENCY INC (Plaintiff); As to: HENRY M LEE LAW CORPORATION (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 03/06/2019; Service Cost: 30.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: NATIONAL CREDIT CONTROL AGENCY INC (Plaintiff); As to: HENRY M LEE (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 03/06/2019; Service Cost: 60.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 06/07/2019
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by: NATIONAL CREDIT CONTROL AGENCY INC (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by: NATIONAL CREDIT CONTROL AGENCY INC (Plaintiff); As to: HENRY M LEE (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2019
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 scheduled for 01/21/2020 at 08:30 AM in Norwalk Courthouse at Department A

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2019
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Ann H. Park in Department A Norwalk Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/15/2019
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Collections Case (CCP 3.740)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/15/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: NATIONAL CREDIT CONTROL AGENCY INC (Plaintiff); As to: HENRY M LEE LAW CORPORATION (Defendant); HENRY M LEE (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/15/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: NATIONAL CREDIT CONTROL AGENCY INC (Plaintiff); As to: HENRY M LEE LAW CORPORATION (Defendant); HENRY M LEE (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/15/2019
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: NATIONAL CREDIT CONTROL AGENCY INC (Plaintiff); As to: HENRY M LEE LAW CORPORATION (Defendant); HENRY M LEE (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/15/2019
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740); Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/15/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where NATIONAL CREDIT CONTROL AGENCY INC is a litigant

Latest cases where HENRY M LEE LAW CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer LOVE FRANKLIN JAY