This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/24/2019 at 03:54:31 (UTC).

NATIONAL COMMERCIAL RECOVERY INC VS HONG KONG DISTRIBUTION CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 11/17/2015 NATIONAL COMMERCIAL RECOVERY INC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against HONG KONG DISTRIBUTION CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****4373

  • Filing Date:

    11/17/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

NATIONAL COMMERCIAL RECOVERY INC

NATIONAL COMMERCIAL RECOVERY INC DBA BLAIR SMITH AND ASSOCIATES

Defendants

HONG KONG DISTRIBUTION CORPORATION

HONG KONG SUPERMARKET OF MONROVIA

SGHK SUPERMARKET LTD

HONG KONG SUPERMARKET OF MONTEREY

HONG KONG SUPERMARKETS OF

KYAW MYINT

TRAN ANH

CAI EMILY

SGHK SUPERMARKET LTD DBA HONG KONG SUPERMARKET

TRAN ANH AKA TRAN ANH N AKA TRAN ANH O

HONG KONG SUPERMARKET OF MONTEREY DBA HONG KONG SUPERMARKET

HONG KONG SUPERMARKET OF MONROVIA DBA HONG KONG SUPERMARKET

HONG KONG SUPERMARKETS OF DBA HONG KONG SUPERMARKET

KYAW MYINT AKA KYAW JEFFREY AKA KYAW MYINT J AKA KYAW MYINT JEFFREY AKA MYINT KYAW AKA WU JEFFREY AKA WU MYINT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GLENN A BESNYL ATTY AT LAW

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/17/2016
  • HEARING DELETED - OFF CALENDAR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2016
  • DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE-ENTIRE ACTION, FILED & ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2016
  • PROOF OF SERVICE TO COMPLAINT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2015
  • NON-JURY TRIAL SET FOR 05/17/17, 08:30 AM, DEPT 77 * * DELETED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2015
  • OSC SET 11/19/18, 08:30 AM, DEPT. 77 PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER * * DELETED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2015
  • COMPLAINT FILED - OTHER COLLECTION CASE Filing Fee: 225.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2015
  • SUMMONS FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where HONG KONG DISTRIBUTION CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where NATIONAL COMMERCIAL RECOVERY INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION DBA BLAIR SMITH AND ASSOCIATES is a litigant

Latest cases where HONG KONG SUPERMARKET is a litigant