Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/09/2021 at 00:25:18 (UTC).

NATALIE RAMIREZ VS ARTURO ANSELMO MONZON

Case Summary

On 04/26/2018 NATALIE RAMIREZ filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against ARTURO ANSELMO MONZON. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is GEORGINA T. RIZK. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6479

  • Filing Date:

    04/26/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

GEORGINA T. RIZK

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

RAMIREZ NATALIE

Defendant

MONZON ARTURO ANSELMO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PACHECO GEORGE B. JR

 

Court Documents

Order - Dismissal - Order - Dismissal

6/7/2021: Order - Dismissal - Order - Dismissal

Minute Order - Minute Order (Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service;)

6/7/2021: Minute Order - Minute Order (Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service;)

Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel - Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel

2/4/2020: Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel - Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel

Declaration in Support of Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil - Declaration in Support of Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil

2/4/2020: Declaration in Support of Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil - Declaration in Support of Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil

Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to be Relieved as Counsel)

3/2/2020: Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to be Relieved as Counsel)

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order - Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

4/16/2020: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order - Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

Minute Order - Minute Order (Court Order)

5/5/2020: Minute Order - Minute Order (Court Order)

Proof of Service by Mail - Proof of Service by Mail

6/29/2020: Proof of Service by Mail - Proof of Service by Mail

Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel - Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel

6/29/2020: Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel - Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel

Order Granting Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil - Order Granting Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil

6/29/2020: Order Granting Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil - Order Granting Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Hearing on Motion to be Relieved as Counsel; Trial Setting Co...) of 07/09/2020

7/9/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Hearing on Motion to be Relieved as Counsel; Trial Setting Co...) of 07/09/2020

Minute Order - Minute Order (Trial Setting Conference)

2/3/2021: Minute Order - Minute Order (Trial Setting Conference)

Minute Order - Minute Order (Court Order re: Continuance;)

4/7/2021: Minute Order - Minute Order (Court Order re: Continuance;)

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order re: Continuance;) of 04/07/2021

4/7/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order re: Continuance;) of 04/07/2021

Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

10/24/2019: Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

Summons - on Complaint

4/26/2018: Summons - on Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

4/26/2018: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

4/26/2018: Complaint

13 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/07/2021
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by Natalie Ramirez on 04/26/2018, entered Order for Dismissal without prejudice as to the entire action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • DocketOrder - Dismissal; Issued and Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • DocketMinute Order (Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service;)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service;) of 06/07/2021; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 06/07/2021 at 01:30 PM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26 updated: Result Date to 06/07/2021; Result Type to Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 06/07/2021 at 01:30 PM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • DocketMinute Order (Court Order re: Continuance;)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Court Order re: Continuance;) of 04/07/2021; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 04/29/2021 at 10:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26 Not Held - Advanced and Vacated on 02/03/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • DocketReset - Court Unavailable, Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 06/07/2021 at 09:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26 Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court was rescheduled to 06/07/2021 01:30 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
29 More Docket Entries
  • 10/24/2019
  • DocketPursuant to the request of plaintiff, Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 10/24/2019 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94 Held - Continued was rescheduled to 06/25/2020 08:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2019
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 06/25/2020 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2019
  • DocketMinute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Natalie Ramirez (Plaintiff); As to: Arturo Anselmo Monzon (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2018
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Natalie Ramirez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2018
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2018
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2018
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Georgina T. Rizk in Department 94 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2018
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 10/24/2019 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2018
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 04/29/2021 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: 18STLC06479    Hearing Date: July 09, 2020    Dept: 26

MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL

(CCP § 284(2); CRC Rule 3.1362)

TENTATIVE RULING

Motion of Attorney George B. Pacheco, Esq. to Withdraw as Counsel for Plaintiff Natalie Ramirez is GRANTED. PROPOSED ORDERS HAVE BEEN FILED AND SERVED. THIS RULING TO BE EFFECTIVE UPON FILING OF PROOF OF SERVICE OF SIGNED ORDERS UPON ALL PARTIES.

Case Number: 18STLC06479    Hearing Date: March 02, 2020    Dept: 26

MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL

(CCP § 284(2); CRC Rule 3.1362)

TENTATIVE RULING

Motion of Attorney George B. Pacheco, Esq. to Withdraw as Counsel for Plaintiff Natalie Ramirez is CONTINUED TO MAY 4, 2020 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 94.

MOVING PARTY HAS NOT FILED, LODGED, NOR SERVED A PROPOSED ORDER ON JUDICIAL COUNCIL FORM MC-053 AS REQUIRED BY CAL. RULES OF COURT RULE 3.1362, SUBDIVISION (E).

AT LEAST 16 DAYS PRIOR TO THE NEW HEARING DATE, MOVING PARTY IS TO FILE AND SERVE SUPPLEMENTAL PAPERS CORRECTING THE DEFECTS NOTED ABOVE. PROOF OF SERVICE OF THE SAME IS TO BE FILED CONCURRENTLY. FAILURE TO COMPLY WITH THE COURT’S ORDERS MAY RESULT IN THE MOTION BEING PLACED OFF CALENDAR OR DENIED.

Moving party to give notice to client and all parties.

Parties may submit via e mail Monday by 10 a.m.

related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer PACHECO GEORGE B. JR