This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/25/2016 at 04:48:05 (UTC).

NASH, KEITH VS BURGER KING

Case Summary

On 11/20/2013 NASH, KEITH filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against BURGER KING. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****6583

  • Filing Date:

    11/20/2013

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

NASH KEITH

Defendants

BURGER KING

MANGEN ENTERPRISES INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

NASH, KEITH

LAW OFFICE OF MIFFLINF & ASSOC

Defendant Attorney

LAW OFFICE OF CRAIG A HOLTZ

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/13/2016
  • CASE DESTROYED PURSUANT TO GC 68152 D(1)/GC 68152 D(2)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/15/2015
  • HEARING DELETED - OFF CALENDAR

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/08/2015
  • DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE-ENTIRE ACTION, FILED & ENTERED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/06/2015
  • A/C CALENDAR-HEARING DATE DELETED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/06/2015
  • STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL AND ORDER SIGNED AND FILED THIS DATE.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/06/2015
  • NON-JURY TRIAL SET FOR 08/19/15, 08:30 AM, DEPT 77 * * DELETED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/06/2014
  • RESPONSE FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/06/2014
  • DEMAND OFR JURY TRIAL FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/06/2014
  • NOTICE OF POSTING OF JURY FEES FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/06/2014
  • JURY FEE DEPOSIT RECEIVED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2014
  • AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT FILED FOR FICTITIOUS NAME

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2013
  • SUMMONS FILED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2013
  • SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2013
  • NON-JURY TRIAL SET FOR 05/20/15, 08:30 AM, DEPT 77 * * DELETED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/21/2013
  • OSC SET 11/21/16, 08:30 AM, DEPT. 77 PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER * * DELETED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/20/2013
  • COMPLAINT FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/20/2013
  • FEE WAIVER FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/20/2013
  • FEE WAIVER FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/20/2013
  • A/C - FEE WAIVER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less