This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/26/2020 at 17:21:51 (UTC).

NASCH WESTLAKE COMMERCE CENTRAL LP VS KORY CARPENTER

Case Summary

On 08/07/2019 NASCH WESTLAKE COMMERCE CENTRAL LP filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against KORY CARPENTER. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is JAMES E. BLANCARTE. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******7306

  • Filing Date:

    08/07/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

JAMES E. BLANCARTE

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

NASCH WESTLAKE COMMERCE CENTRAL LP

NASCH WESTLAKE COMMERCE CENTER LP

Defendant

CARPENTER KORY DBA CARPENTERS WEST WOODWORK

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ZEFF MICHAEL D.

 

Court Documents

Judgment - Judgment Proposed Default Judgment by Court

5/15/2020: Judgment - Judgment Proposed Default Judgment by Court

Notice of Rejection - Application for Default Judgment by Court - Contract or Tort - Notice of Rejection - Application for Default Judgment by Court - Contract or Tort

4/10/2020: Notice of Rejection - Application for Default Judgment by Court - Contract or Tort - Notice of Rejection - Application for Default Judgment by Court - Contract or Tort

Declaration re: Attorney's Fees - Declaration re: Attorney's Fees

4/20/2020: Declaration re: Attorney's Fees - Declaration re: Attorney's Fees

Supplemental Declaration (name extension) - Supplemental Declaration IN SUPPORT OF REQUEST FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT

3/17/2020: Supplemental Declaration (name extension) - Supplemental Declaration IN SUPPORT OF REQUEST FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

3/17/2020: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information - Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

3/17/2020: Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information - Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

Notice of Rejection - Application for Default Judgment by Court - Contract or Tort - Notice of Rejection - Application for Default Judgment by Court - Contract or Tort

3/2/2020: Notice of Rejection - Application for Default Judgment by Court - Contract or Tort - Notice of Rejection - Application for Default Judgment by Court - Contract or Tort

Request (name extension) - Request PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT AND DECLARATIONS

1/3/2020: Request (name extension) - Request PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT AND DECLARATIONS

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

11/5/2019: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Default Judgment - Unlawful Detainer

11/5/2019: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Default Judgment - Unlawful Detainer

First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

8/7/2019: First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

Complaint - Complaint

8/7/2019: Complaint - Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

8/7/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

8/7/2019: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Summons - Summons on Complaint

8/7/2019: Summons - Summons on Complaint

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/15/2020
  • DocketDefault judgment by Court entered for Plaintiff NASCH WESTLAKE COMMERCE CENTER LP against Defendant KORY CARPENTER DBA CARPENTERS WEST WOODWORK on the Complaint filed by NASCH WESTLAKE COMMERCE CENTRAL LP on 08/07/2019 for damages of $2,891.11, attorney fees of $263.46, and costs of $320.40 for a total of $3,474.97.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2020
  • DocketJudgment Proposed Default Judgment by Court; Signed and Filed by: NASCH WESTLAKE COMMERCE CENTER LP (Plaintiff); As to: KORY CARPENTER (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2020
  • DocketUpdated -- Judgment Proposed Default Judgment by Court: As To Parties changed from KORY CARPENTER (Defendant) to KORY CARPENTER (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2020
  • DocketUpdated -- NASCH WESTLAKE COMMERCE CENTER LP (Plaintiff): Organization Name changed from NASCH WESTLAKE COMMERCE CENTRAL LP to NASCH WESTLAKE COMMERCE CENTER LP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2020
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 02/03/2021 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 05/15/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 08/10/2022 at 10:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 05/15/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2020
  • DocketUpdated -- Judgment Proposed Default Judgment by Court: Filed By: NASCH WESTLAKE COMMERCE CENTRAL LP (Plaintiff); Result changed from Entered to Granted; Result Date: 04/27/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2020
  • DocketDeclaration re: Attorney's Fees; Filed by: NASCH WESTLAKE COMMERCE CENTRAL LP (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2020
  • DocketJudgment BY COURT BY DEFAULT - Rejected; Submitted by: NASCH WESTLAKE COMMERCE CENTRAL LP (Plaintiff); As to: KORY CARPENTER (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2020
  • DocketNotice of Rejection - Application for Default Judgment by Court - Contract or Tort; Filed by: Court

    Read MoreRead Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 11/05/2019
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: NASCH WESTLAKE COMMERCE CENTRAL LP (Plaintiff); As to: KORY CARPENTER (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 09/16/2019; Service Cost: 79.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2019
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by: NASCH WESTLAKE COMMERCE CENTRAL LP (Plaintiff); As to: KORY CARPENTER (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2019
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 02/03/2021 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2019
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 08/10/2022 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: NASCH WESTLAKE COMMERCE CENTRAL LP (Plaintiff); As to: KORY CARPENTER (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: NASCH WESTLAKE COMMERCE CENTRAL LP (Plaintiff); As to: KORY CARPENTER (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2019
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: NASCH WESTLAKE COMMERCE CENTRAL LP (Plaintiff); As to: KORY CARPENTER (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2019
  • DocketFirst Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2019
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. James E. Blancarte in Department 94 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where NASCH WESTLAKE COMMERCE CENTER LP is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ZEFF MICHAEL D.