This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/20/2019 at 17:35:01 (UTC).

NASCH WESTLAKE COMMERCE CENTER L.P. VS GENNARO, CATERINA

Case Summary

On 07/03/2012 NASCH WESTLAKE COMMERCE CENTER L P filed a Property - Commercial Eviction lawsuit against GENNARO, CATERINA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Van Nuys Courthouse East located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****3873

  • Filing Date:

    07/03/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Commercial Eviction

  • Courthouse:

    Van Nuys Courthouse East

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

NASCH WESTLAKE COMMERCE CENTER L.P.

Defendants

GENNARO CATERINA

POLEATES INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

ZEFF, MICHAEL D.

LEVUN, ROY ALAN

LEVUN ROY ALAN

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/11/2013
  • DocketREQUEST FOR COURT JUDGMENT REJECTED. REQUEST FOR COURT JUDGMENT REJECTED. DISMISSAL OF 'DOES' 1-50 NEEDED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2013
  • DocketSUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2013
  • DocketAPPLICATION TO AMEND JUDGMENT FILED APPLICATION TO AMEND JUDGMENT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2012
  • DocketWRIT RETURNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2012
  • DocketWRIT OF POSSESSION OF REAL PROPERTY ISSUED TO LA COUNTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2012
  • DocketDEFAULT JUDGMENT BY CLERK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2012
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE FOR UNNAMED OCCUPANTS FILED. Proof of Service for Unnamed Occupants Filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2012
  • DocketJUDGMENT FOR ALL UNNAMED OCCUPANTS GRANTED PURSUANT TO 415.46 CCP. Judgment for all Unnamed Occupants granted pursuant to 415.46 CCP.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2012
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE TO COMPLAINT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2012
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DEFAULT FILED AND ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2012
  • DocketDEFAULT JUDGMENT FOR ALL UNNAMED OCCUPANTS RECEIVED. Default Judgment for all Unnamed Occupants Received.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2012
  • DocketSUBMISSION FOR DEFAULT AND JUDGMENT PENDING *** DEFAULT PROCESSE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2012
  • DocketNOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER MAILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2012
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED Filing Fee: 240.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2012
  • DocketSUMMONS FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where NASCH WESTLAKE COMMERCE CENTER LP is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer LEVUN ROY ALAN

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ZEFF MICHAEL D.