This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/16/2016 at 15:20:52 (UTC).

NASCH VILLAGE GREEN LP VS. FLORADE WELLNESS CENTER CORP

Case Summary

On 07/16/2014 NASCH VILLAGE GREEN LP filed a Property - Commercial Eviction lawsuit against FLORADE WELLNESS CENTER CORP. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Santa Monica Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is H. JAY FORD III. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****7083

  • Filing Date:

    07/16/2014

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Commercial Eviction

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

H. JAY FORD III

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

NASCH VILLAGE GREEN LP

Defendant

FLORADE WELLNESS CENTER CORP

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ROSENTHAL, WITHEM & ZEFF - MICHAEL D. ZEFF

Attorney at ROSENTHAL, WITHEM & ZEFF

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/07/2016
  • CASE FILE ORDERED DESTROYED PER SECTION(S) 71008 AND/OR 68152 OF THE GOVERNMENT CODE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2016
  • PURSUANT TO COURT ORDER THE CASE FILE WAS DESTROYED ON 10/07/16 . CASE SET TO BE PURGED FROM THE SYSTEM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2014
  • DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE FILED FOR THE ENTIRE ACTION AS TO ALL DEFENDANT(S) AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION(S).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2014
  • NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILING MAILED TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/COUNSEL. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2014
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED. RN SM500862036.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2014
  • SUMMONS ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2014
  • SUMMONS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2014
  • NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT ON FILE. CASE IS ASSIGNED TO DEPT. WES , HONORABLE H. JAY FORD III .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2014
  • MATTER SET FOR HEARING ON ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ON 01/12/15 AT 08:30A M, IN DEPT. CLK .

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where NASCH VILLAGE GREEN LP is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ZEFF MICHAEL D.