This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/12/2019 at 07:16:36 (UTC).

NASCH VILLAGE GREEN, LP VS FAMILY TIME FILMS, INC., ET AL.

Case Summary

On 01/11/2019 NASCH VILLAGE GREEN, LP filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against FAMILY TIME FILMS, INC . This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is JON R. TAKASUGI. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0427

  • Filing Date:

    01/11/2019

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

JON R. TAKASUGI

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

NASCH VILLAGE GREEN LP

Defendants

MAYNARD JAMES AKA JAMES RAMBADT

FAMILY TIME FILMS INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ZEFF MICHAEL D.

 

Court Documents

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

1/11/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint - Complaint

1/11/2019: Complaint - Complaint

Summons - Summons on Complaint

1/11/2019: Summons - Summons on Complaint

First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

1/11/2019: First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

1/11/2019: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

2/1/2019: Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

2/1/2019: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

5/2/2019: Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/03/2019
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 07/10/2020 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 05/03/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2019
  • Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 01/14/2022 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 05/03/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2019
  • On the Complaint filed by Nasch Village Green, LP on 01/11/2019, entered Request for Dismissal with prejudice filed by Nasch Village Green, LP as to the entire action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2019
  • Request for Dismissal; Filed by: Nasch Village Green, LP (Plaintiff); As to: Family Time Films, Inc. (Defendant); James aka James Rambadt Maynard (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2019
  • Case reassigned to Stanley Mosk Courthouse in Department 94 - Hon. James E. Blancarte; Reason: Inventory Transfer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2019
  • Proof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Nasch Village Green, LP (Plaintiff); As to: James aka James Rambadt Maynard (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 01/22/2019; Service Cost: 96.90; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2019
  • Proof of Personal Service; Filed by: Nasch Village Green, LP (Plaintiff); As to: Family Time Films, Inc. (Defendant); Service Date: 01/19/2019; Service Cost: 76.95; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2019
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 07/10/2020 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2019
  • Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 01/14/2022 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2019
  • Case assigned to Hon. Jon R. Takasugi in Department 94 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2019
  • Complaint; Filed by: Nasch Village Green, LP (Plaintiff); As to: Family Time Films, Inc. (Defendant); James aka James Rambadt Maynard (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2019
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Nasch Village Green, LP (Plaintiff); As to: Family Time Films, Inc. (Defendant); James aka James Rambadt Maynard (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2019
  • Summons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Nasch Village Green, LP (Plaintiff); As to: Family Time Films, Inc. (Defendant); James aka James Rambadt Maynard (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2019
  • Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2019
  • First Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where NASCH VILLAGE GREEN LP is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ZEFF MICHAEL D.