This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/04/2022 at 15:49:14 (UTC).

NASCH VILLAGE GREEN LP VS DR. SHARON. NORLING

Case Summary

On 11/04/2019 NASCH VILLAGE GREEN LP filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against DR SHARON NORLING. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is SERENA R. MURILLO. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0201

  • Filing Date:

    11/04/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

SERENA R. MURILLO

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

NASCH VILLAGE GREEN LP

Defendant

NORLING DR. SHARON DBA MIND BODY SPIRIT CENTER

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ZEFF MICHAEL D.

Defendant Attorney

ROTH THOMAS MICHAEL

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial;)

9/13/2021: Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial;)

Order - Dismissal - Order - Dismissal

9/13/2021: Order - Dismissal - Order - Dismissal

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial;) of 09/13/2021

9/13/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial;) of 09/13/2021

Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial;)

5/3/2021: Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial;)

Answer - Answer

1/6/2021: Answer - Answer

Notice of Rejection - Pleadings - Notice of Rejection - Pleadings

12/30/2020: Notice of Rejection - Pleadings - Notice of Rejection - Pleadings

Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

12/24/2020: Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/13/2021
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by Nasch Village Green LP on 11/04/2019, entered Order for Dismissal without prejudice as to the entire action, pursuant to CCP 581(b)(5)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • DocketOrder - Dismissal; Issued and Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • DocketMinute Order (Non-Jury Trial;)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial;) of 09/13/2021; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 09/13/2021 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26 Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court on 09/13/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 09/13/2021 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • DocketMinute Order (Non-Jury Trial;)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • DocketPursuant to oral stipulation, Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 05/03/2021 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26 Not Held - Continued - Stipulation was rescheduled to 09/13/2021 08:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 11/07/2022 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26 Not Held - Advanced and Vacated on 01/06/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: Dr. Sharon Norling (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2020
  • DocketNotice of Rejection - Pleadings; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/24/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Nasch Village Green LP (Plaintiff); As to: Dr. Sharon Norling (Defendant); Service Date: 12/21/2020; Service Cost: 360.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2019
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 05/03/2021 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2019
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 11/07/2022 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2019
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Serena R. Murillo in Department 94 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Nasch Village Green LP (Plaintiff); As to: Dr. Sharon Norling (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Nasch Village Green LP (Plaintiff); As to: Dr. Sharon Norling (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2019
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Nasch Village Green LP (Plaintiff); As to: Dr. Sharon Norling (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2019
  • DocketFirst Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where NASCH VILLAGE GREEN LP is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Roth, Thomas M.