This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/12/2022 at 04:14:40 (UTC).

NASCH VILLAGE GREEN LP VS DANIELLA SCHRADER

Case Summary

On 10/27/2020 NASCH VILLAGE GREEN LP filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against DANIELLA SCHRADER. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is SERENA R. MURILLO. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******9044

  • Filing Date:

    10/27/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

SERENA R. MURILLO

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

NASCH VILLAGE GREEN LP

Defendant

SCHRADER DANIELLA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ZEFF MICHAEL D.

Defendant Attorney

ZEMANEK JOHN

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

10/27/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

10/27/2020: First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

10/27/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - Summons on Complaint

10/27/2020: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Complaint - Complaint

10/27/2020: Complaint - Complaint

Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

12/24/2020: Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

Answer - Answer

1/19/2021: Answer - Answer

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/31/2023
  • Hearing10/31/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 26 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2022
  • Hearing04/26/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 26 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: Daniella Schrader (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/24/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Nasch Village Green LP (Plaintiff); As to: Daniella Schrader (Defendant); Service Date: 11/27/2020; Service Cost: 135.90; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Nasch Village Green LP (Plaintiff); As to: Daniella Schrader (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Nasch Village Green LP (Plaintiff); As to: Daniella Schrader (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Nasch Village Green LP (Plaintiff); As to: Daniella Schrader (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • DocketFirst Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 04/26/2022 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 10/31/2023 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Serena R. Murillo in Department 26 Spring Street Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where NASCH VILLAGE GREEN LP is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ZEMANEK JOHN