This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/06/2019 at 03:09:21 (UTC).

NASA FEDERAL CREDIT UNION VS SOCORRO GARDUNO

Case Summary

On 02/05/2019 a Contract - Other Contract case was filed by NASA FEDERAL CREDIT UNION against SOCORRO GARDUNO in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1308

  • Filing Date:

    02/05/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

JAMES E. BLANCARTE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

NASA FEDERAL CREDIT UNION

Defendant

GARDUNO SOCORRO AKA SOCORRO P. GARDUNO AKA SOCORRO G. PEDROZA AKA SOCORRO PEDROZA GARDUNO AKA SOCORRO PEDROZA

 

Court Documents

Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service) - Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service)

3/8/2019: Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service) - Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service)

Answer - Answer

3/6/2019: Answer - Answer

Summons - Summons on Complaint

2/5/2019: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

2/5/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint - Complaint

2/5/2019: Complaint - Complaint

First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

2/5/2019: First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

2/5/2019: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/08/2019
  • Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service); Filed by: NASA Federal Credit Union (Plaintiff); As to: Socorro Garduno (Defendant); Mailing Date: 02/15/2019; Service Cost: 60.00; Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2019
  • Answer; Filed by: Socorro Garduno (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2019
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 08/04/2020 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2019
  • Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 02/08/2022 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2019
  • Case assigned to Hon. James E. Blancarte in Department 94 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2019
  • Complaint; Filed by: NASA Federal Credit Union (Plaintiff); As to: Socorro Garduno (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2019
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: NASA Federal Credit Union (Plaintiff); As to: Socorro Garduno (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2019
  • Summons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: NASA Federal Credit Union (Plaintiff); As to: Socorro Garduno (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2019
  • Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2019
  • First Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: 19STLC01308    Hearing Date: November 13, 2019    Dept: 94

NASA Federal Credit Union v. Garduno, et al.

MOTION TO COMPEL RESPONSES TO INTERROGATORIES AND REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION; DEEM REQUESTS FOR ADMISSION ADMITTED

(CCP §§ 2030.290; 2031.300; 2033.280)

TENTATIVE RULING:

Plaintiff NASA Federal Credit Union’s (1) Motion To Deem Requests For Admission, Set One, Admitted Against Defendant; Request For Monetary Sanctions; (2) Motion To Compel Defendant’s Responses To Requests For Production Of Documents, Set One; Request For Monetary Sanctions; and (3) Motion To Compel Defendant’s Responses To Form Interrogatories, Set One; Request For Monetary Sanctions, are GRANTED. VERIFIED RESPONSES WITHOUT OBJECTIONS TO THE INTERROGATORIES AND REQUESTS FOR PRODUCTION ARE TO BE SERVED WITHIN 20 DAYS. SANCTIONS ARE AWARDED AGAINST DEFENDANT IN THE AMOUNT OF $730.00, TO BE PAID TO PLAINTIFF’S COUNSEL WITHIN 30 DAYS.

ANALYSIS:

Plaintiff NASA Federal Credit Union (“Plaintiff”) filed the instant action for breach of loan agreement against Defendant Socorro Garduno aka Socorro P. Garduno aka Socorro G. Pedroza aka Garduno

Socorro Pedroza aka Socorro Pedroza (“Defendant”) on February 5, 2019. Plaintiff filed the instant discovery motions on July 25, 2019. To date, no opposition has been filed.

Plaintiff propounded Form Interrogatories, Set One, Request to Produce Documents, Set One, and Requests for Admission, Set One, on Defendant on March 21, 2019. (Motions, Graziano Decl., ¶3 and Exh. A.) To date, Defendant has not provided any verified responses to the discovery requests. (Id. a ¶¶4-6.) There is no requirement for a prior meet and confer effort before a motion to compel initial responses can be filed. Further, the motion can be brought any time after the responding party fails to provide the responses. Based on the foregoing, Plaintiff is entitled to an order that Defendant serve verified responses to the interrogatories and document demands, without objections within 20 days. (Code Civ. Proc., §§ 2030.290, 2031.300.) Plaintiff is also entitled to an order deeming the requests for admission admitted against Defendant. (Code Civ. Proc., § 2033.280.)

The Court also finds Defendant’s failure to respond a misuse of the discovery process. (Code Civ. Proc., § 2023.010, subd. (d).) Sanctions have been sufficiently noticed, however, the amount requested is excessive given the simplicity of these nearly identical and unopposed motions. Therefore, Defendant is ordered to pay sanctions in the amount of $730.00, based on two (2) hours of attorney time billed at $275.00 an hour, plus three filing fees of $60.00 each, within 30 days. (Motions, Graziano Decl., ¶8.)

Moving party to give notice.

Parties who intend to submit on this tentative must send an email to the Court at SMCdept94@lacourt.org as directed by the instructions provided on the court website at www.lacourt.org. If the department does not receive an email and there are no appearances at the hearing, the motion will be placed off calendar.