This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/05/2021 at 01:00:17 (UTC).

NARJES DERIS VS YOLANDA AVINA, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 06/20/2018 NARJES DERIS filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against YOLANDA AVINA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is JON R. TAKASUGI. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******8668

  • Filing Date:

    06/20/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

JON R. TAKASUGI

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DERIS NARJES

Defendants and Cross Defendants

OSORIO MARTIN

MENA BEATRIZ

AVINA YOLANDA

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff

MENA BEATRIZ

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MILLMAN MICHAEL LEE

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

YOUNG SARA

SCHARF GREGORY A.

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

2/16/2021: Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

11/25/2020: Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

Minute Order - Minute Order (Court Order Re: Non-Jury Trial)

5/12/2020: Minute Order - Minute Order (Court Order Re: Non-Jury Trial)

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order Re: Non-Jury Trial) of 05/12/2020

5/12/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order Re: Non-Jury Trial) of 05/12/2020

Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses; Hear...)

2/6/2020: Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses; Hear...)

Motion to Compel (name extension) - Motion to Compel Motion to Compel Further Responses by Plaintiff to Demands for Production and for Monetary Sanctions in the Amount of $436.65

11/21/2019: Motion to Compel (name extension) - Motion to Compel Motion to Compel Further Responses by Plaintiff to Demands for Production and for Monetary Sanctions in the Amount of $436.65

Motion to Compel (name extension) - Motion to Compel Motion to Compel Further Responses by Plaintiff to Form Interrogatories and for Monetary Sanctions in the Amount of $436.65

11/21/2019: Motion to Compel (name extension) - Motion to Compel Motion to Compel Further Responses by Plaintiff to Form Interrogatories and for Monetary Sanctions in the Amount of $436.65

General Denial - General Denial

12/4/2019: General Denial - General Denial

Order (name extension) - Order GRANTING TRIAL CONTINUANCE

12/12/2019: Order (name extension) - Order GRANTING TRIAL CONTINUANCE

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees - Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

6/21/2019: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees - Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Summons - Summons on Complaint

7/25/2019: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Substitution of Attorney - Substitution of Attorney

11/1/2018: Substitution of Attorney - Substitution of Attorney

Answer - Answer

11/8/2018: Answer - Answer

Demand for Jury Trial - Demand for Jury Trial

11/8/2018: Demand for Jury Trial - Demand for Jury Trial

Civil Case Cover Sheet

6/20/2018: Civil Case Cover Sheet

23 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/03/2021
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by Narjes Deris on 06/20/2018, entered Order for Dismissal without prejudice as to the entire action, pursuant to Code of Civil Procedure Section 581(b)(3)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2021
  • DocketMinute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 06/03/2021; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2021
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 06/03/2021 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25 updated: Result Date to 06/03/2021; Result Type to Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 06/23/2021 at 10:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 06/03/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • DocketUpdated -- Event scheduled for 06/03/2021 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25 Type changed from Jury Trial to Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by Narjes Deris on 06/20/2018, entered Request for Dismissal with prejudice filed by Narjes Deris as to Yolanda Avina

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2021
  • DocketThere being no judge available this date, Jury Trial scheduled for 02/17/2021 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25 Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court was rescheduled to 06/03/2021 08:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2021
  • DocketNotice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • DocketOn the Cross-Complaint filed by Beatriz Mena on 07/25/2019, entered Request for Dismissal without prejudice filed by Beatriz Mena as to Martin Osorio

    Read MoreRead Less
43 More Docket Entries
  • 07/23/2018
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Filed by: Clerk; As to: Beatriz Mena (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2018
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: Beatriz Mena (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2018
  • DocketRequest to Waive Court Fees; Filed by: Beatriz Mena (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2018
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2018
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2018
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Narjes Deris (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Narjes Deris (Plaintiff); As to: Yolanda Avina (Defendant); Martin Osorio (Defendant); Beatriz Mena (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2018
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Jon R. Takasugi in Department 94 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2018
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 12/18/2019 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2018
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 06/23/2021 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: 18STLC08668    Hearing Date: February 06, 2020    Dept: 25

MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES TO DEMANDS FOR PRODUCTION AND FORM INTERROGATORIES; REQUEST FOR SANCTIONS

(CCP §§ 2030.300, 2031.310)

TENTATIVE RULING:

Defendant Beatriz Mena’s (1) Motion to Compel Further Responses to Demand for Production by Plaintiff and Request for Sanctions and (2) Motion to Compel Further Responses to Form Interrogatories by Plaintiff and Request for Sanctions are PLACED OFF CALENDAR.

I. Background & Discussion

On June 20, 2018, Plaintiff Narjes Deris (“Plaintiff”) filed an action for personal injury and property damage against Defendants Yolanda Avina (“Avina”), Martin Osorio (“Osorio”), and Beatriz Mena (“Mena”). On July 25, 2019, after obtaining leave of Court, Mena filed a Cross-Complaint for comparative indemnity, contribution, and declaratory relief against Defendant Osorio.

On November 21, 2019, Defendant Mena filed the instant (1) Motion to Compel Further Responses to Demand for Production by Plaintiff and Request for Sanctions and (2) Motion to Compel Further Responses to Form Interrogatories by Plaintiff and Request for Sanctions (collectively, the “Motions”).

On January 21, 2020, Plaintiff filed a request for dismissal with prejudice as to Defendant Mena. On January 24, 2020, Mena was dismissed from the action.

Accordingly, the Motions are PLACED OFF CALENDAR.

II. Conclusion & Order

Based on the foregoing, Defendant Beatriz Mena’s (1) Motion to Compel Further Responses to Demand for Production by Plaintiff and Request for Sanctions and (2) Motion to Compel Further Responses to Form Interrogatories by Plaintiff and Request for Sanctions are PLACED OFF CALENDAR.

Moving party is ordered to give notice.

related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer MILLMAN MICHAEL LEE