This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/03/2020 at 11:17:52 (UTC).

NANNETTE HANSBERRY VS ANTHONY CALLOWAY

Case Summary

On 11/19/2019 NANNETTE HANSBERRY filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against ANTHONY CALLOWAY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is SERENA R. MURILLO. The case status is Other - Consolidated.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0668

  • Filing Date:

    11/19/2019

  • Case Status:

    Other - Consolidated

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

SERENA R. MURILLO

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HANSBERRY NANNETTE

Defendant

CALLOWAY ANTHONY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MEHRBAN MORSE

Defendant Attorney

WILLOUGHBY ANTHONY W.

 

Court Documents

Answer - Answer

3/6/2020: Answer - Answer

Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Default and Default Jud...)

6/26/2020: Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Default and Default Jud...)

Notice (name extension) - Notice of Ruling

6/29/2020: Notice (name extension) - Notice of Ruling

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order - Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

6/5/2020: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order - Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order - Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

4/14/2020: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order - Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

1/13/2020: Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

1/13/2020: Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

1/13/2020: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment - Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment

1/13/2020: Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment - Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment

Default Judgment - Default Judgment

2/13/2020: Default Judgment - Default Judgment

Abstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims - Abstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims

2/28/2020: Abstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims - Abstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims

Notice of Related Case - Notice of Related Case

3/6/2020: Notice of Related Case - Notice of Related Case

Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Default and / or Default Judgment - Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Default and / or Default Judgment

3/6/2020: Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Default and / or Default Judgment - Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Default and / or Default Judgment

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

11/19/2019: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Summons - Summons on Complaint

11/19/2019: Summons - Summons on Complaint

First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

11/19/2019: First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court) - Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

11/20/2019: Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court) - Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/29/2020
  • DocketNotice of Ruling; Filed by: Nannette Hansberry (Plaintiff); As to: Anthony Calloway (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2020
  • DocketUpdated -- Answer: Filed By: Anthony Calloway (Defendant); Result: Stricken; Result Date: 06/26/2020; As To Parties: removed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2020
  • DocketCase numbers 19STLC10668, 19STLC05921 are related; case number 19STLC05921 is the lead case.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2020
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by Nannette Hansberry on 11/19/2019, Default entered on 01/13/2020, Vacated - .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2020
  • DocketUpdated -- On the Complaint filed by Nannette Hansberry on 11/19/2019, judgment entered on 02/13/2020 is vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2020
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by Nannette Hansberry on 11/19/2019, judgment entered on 02/13/2020 as to Anthony Calloway is

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2020
  • DocketMinute Order (Hearing on Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Default and Default Jud...)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2020
  • DocketHearing on Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Default and Default Judgment (CCP 473.5) scheduled for 06/26/2020 at 09:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26 updated: Result Date to 06/26/2020; Result Type to Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2020
  • DocketNotice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2020
  • DocketReset - Court Unavailable, Hearing on Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Default and Default Judgment (CCP 473.5) scheduled for 06/22/2020 at 10:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26 Not Held - Rescheduled by Court was rescheduled to 06/26/2020 09:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
17 More Docket Entries
  • 11/20/2019
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Serena R. Murillo in Department 94 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2019
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 11/22/2022 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2019
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 05/18/2021 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2019
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Signed and Filed by: Clerk; As to: Nannette Hansberry (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2019
  • DocketFirst Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Nannette Hansberry (Plaintiff); As to: Anthony Calloway (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2019
  • DocketRequest to Waive Court Fees; Filed by: Nannette Hansberry (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2019
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Nannette Hansberry (Plaintiff); As to: Anthony Calloway (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Nannette Hansberry (Plaintiff); As to: Anthony Calloway (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: 19STLC10668    Hearing Date: June 26, 2020    Dept: 26

Hansberry v. Calloway, et al.

MOTION TO VACATE DEFAULT AND DEFAULT JUDGMENT; QUASH SERVICE

(CCP §§ 473, 473.5; equity)

CONSOLIDATE

(CCP § 1048)

TENATIVE RULING:

Defendant Anthony Calloway’s Motion to Vacate Default and Default Judgment is PLACED OFF CALENDAR.

Stipulation to Consolidate Action with Hansberry v. Regency West – Leimert Park Village, Inc., LASC Case No. 19STLC05921 is GRANTED AS FOLLOWS:

SERVICE:

[X] Proof of Service Timely Filed (CRC 3.1300) OK

[X] Correct Address (CCP 1013, 1013a) OK

[X] 16/21 Day Lapse (CCP 12c and 1005 (b)) OK

SUMMARY OF COMPLAINT: Action for discrimination on the basis of disability.

REQUEST FOR RELIEF: Set aside default and default judgment on the grounds that Defendant was never properly served with the Summons and Complaint.

OPPOSITION: None filed as of June 22, 2020.

REPLY: None filed as of June 22, 2020.

ANALYSIS:

On November 19, 2019, Plaintiff Nanette Hansberry (“Plaintiff”) filed this action for discrimination on the basis of disability against Defendant Anthony Calloway (“Defendant”). Proof of personal service was filed on January 13, 2020 and default was entered against Defendant on the same date. On February 13, 2020, the Court entered default judgment against Defendant.

On March 6, 2020, Defendant filed the instant Motion to Vacate Default and Default Judgment and his Answer to the Complaint. Defendant also filed an Answer to the Complaint and a Notice of Related Case with respect to LASC Case No. 19STLC05921.

On March 16, 2020, the parties filed a Stipulation to Vacate Defaults and Consolidate Actions in LASC Case No. 19STLC05921.

Discussion

In light of the parties’ Stipulation, the Court rules as follows. Defendant Anthony Calloway’s Motion to Vacate Default and Default Judgment is PLACED OFF CALENDAR.

The Stipulation to Consolidate Action with Hansberry v. Regency West – Leimert Park Village, Inc., LASC Case No. 19STLC05921 is GRANTED AS FOLLOWS:

Plaintiff to give notice.