This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/27/2016 at 09:21:01 (UTC).

NAKAMURA, LILLY D. VS FLOUM, ROBERT B.

Case Summary

On 03/15/2013 NAKAMURA, LILLY D filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against FLOUM, ROBERT B. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, San Pedro Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0266

  • Filing Date:

    03/15/2013

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Pedro Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

NAKAMURA LILLY D.

Defendant

FLOUM ROBERT B.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

NAZAROFF, TANYA J

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/08/2013
  • ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2013
  • WRIT OF EXECUTION ISSUED TO LA COUNTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2013
  • DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2013
  • CASE FILE FORWARDED TO DEPARTMENT SOB FOR DEFAULT COURT JUDGMENT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2013
  • APPLICATION FOR ISSUANCE OF WRIT OF EXECUTION, POSSESSION OR SALE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2013
  • RETURN ON ATTACHMENT/EXECUTION FILED BY THE SHERIFF'S. WRIT FULLY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2013
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION OF REAL PROPERTY ISSUED TO LA COUNTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2013
  • PROOF OF SERVICE TO COMPLAINT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2013
  • CLERK'S NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED AND MAILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2013
  • CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE MAILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2013
  • PROOF OF SERVICE FOR ALL OTHER OCCUPANTS FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2013
  • REQUEST FOR DEFAULT FILED AND ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2013
  • DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY CLERK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2013
  • DEFAULT ENTERED FOR ALL OTHER OCCUPANTS PURSUANT TO CCP 415.46

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2013
  • APPLICATION FOR ISSUANCE OF WRIT OF POSSESSION IS REJECTED. THE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2013
  • SUBMISSION FOR DEFAULT AND JUDGMENT PENDING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2013
  • APPLICATION FOR ISSUANCE OF WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2013
  • NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER MAILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2013
  • COMPLAINT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2013
  • SUMMONS FILED

    Read MoreRead Less