This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/05/2020 at 17:45:38 (UTC).

NAHUM GUTIERREZ VS GUILLERMO ROJAS

Case Summary

On 02/13/2020 NAHUM GUTIERREZ filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against GUILLERMO ROJAS. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Compton Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is VICTOR M. ACEVEDO. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0434

  • Filing Date:

    02/13/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Compton Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

VICTOR M. ACEVEDO

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GUTIERREZ NAHUM

Defendant

ROJAS GUILLERMO DBA K.T. ENGINE REBUILDING

 

Court Documents

RETURNED MAIL - RETURNED MAIL

5/28/2020: RETURNED MAIL - RETURNED MAIL

Notice of Continuance Due to COVID-19 State of Emergency Declarations - Notice of Continuance Due to COVID-19 State of Emergency Declarations

6/12/2020: Notice of Continuance Due to COVID-19 State of Emergency Declarations - Notice of Continuance Due to COVID-19 State of Emergency Declarations

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Notice of Continuance Due to COVID-19 State of Emergency Declarations]

6/12/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Notice of Continuance Due to COVID-19 State of Emergency Declarations]

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 06/04/2020

6/4/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 06/04/2020

Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

6/4/2020: Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)]

3/25/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)]

Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

4/2/2020: Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 04/02/2020

4/2/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 04/02/2020

Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

5/21/2020: Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims) - Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

2/20/2020: Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims) - Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

2/13/2020: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court) - Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

2/13/2020: Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court) - Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/01/2020
  • Hearing09/01/2020 at 08:30 AM in Department 7 at 200 West Compton Blvd., Compton, CA 90220; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2020
  • DocketNotice of Continuance Due to COVID-19 State of Emergency Declarations; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for [Notice of Continuance Due to COVID-19 State of Emergency Declarations]; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2020
  • DocketOn the Court's own motion, Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 07/23/2020 at 08:30 AM in Compton Courthouse at Department 7 Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion was rescheduled to 09/01/2020 08:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2020
  • DocketMinute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 06/04/2020; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2020
  • DocketUpdated -- RETURNED MAIL: Status Date changed from 04/09/2020 to 05/28/2020; As To Parties changed from Guillermo Rojas (Defendant) to Guillermo Rojas (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2020
  • DocketMinute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2020
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 07/23/2020 at 08:30 AM in Compton Courthouse at Department 7

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2020
  • DocketOn the Court's own motion, Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 06/04/2020 at 08:30 AM in Compton Courthouse at Department 7 Not Held - Rescheduled by Court was rescheduled to 07/23/2020 08:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 03/25/2020
  • DocketOn the Court's own motion, Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 05/21/2020 at 08:30 AM in Compton Courthouse at Department 7 Not Held - Rescheduled by Court was rescheduled to 06/04/2020 08:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2020
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 06/04/2020 at 08:30 AM in Compton Courthouse at Department 7

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2020
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 05/21/2020 at 08:30 AM in Compton Courthouse at Department 7

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2020
  • DocketOn the Court's own motion, Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 04/02/2020 at 08:30 AM in Compton Courthouse at Department 7 Not Held - Rescheduled by Court was rescheduled to 05/21/2020 08:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2020
  • DocketProof of Service - Personal (Small Claims); Filed by: Nahum Gutierrez (Plaintiff); As to: Guillermo Rojas (Defendant); Service Cost: 40.00; Service Cost Waived: Yes; Service Date: 02/18/20

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Nahum Gutierrez (Plaintiff); As to: Guillermo Rojas (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • DocketRequest to Waive Court Fees; Filed by: Nahum Gutierrez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Signed and Filed by: Clerk; As to: Nahum Gutierrez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Victor M. Acevedo in Department 7 Compton Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 04/02/2020 at 08:30 AM in Compton Courthouse at Department 7

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.