Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/03/2019 at 09:45:53 (UTC).

MURIEL N. WEBER VS DEROY GREEN

Case Summary

On 12/21/2017 MURIEL N WEBER filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against DEROY GREEN. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, West Covina Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is SUSAN J. TOWNSEND. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0786

  • Filing Date:

    12/21/2017

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    West Covina Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

SUSAN J. TOWNSEND

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WEBER MURIEL N.

Defendant

GREEN DEROY

El Monte, CA 91731

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LONG HELEN GRAYCE

Attorney at H.G. Long and Associates

474 W Orange Show Rd,

San Bernrdno, CA 92408

 

Court Documents

Ex Parte Application (name extension) - For Order Staying Execution of The Judgment And Granting Additional Time To Relocate; Memorandum of Points and Authorities And Declaration In Support Thereof

3/15/2018: Ex Parte Application (name extension) - For Order Staying Execution of The Judgment And Granting Additional Time To Relocate; Memorandum of Points and Authorities And Declaration In Support Thereof

Minute Order - (Hearing on Ex Parte Application For Order Staying Execution o...)

3/15/2018: Minute Order - (Hearing on Ex Parte Application For Order Staying Execution o...)

Writ - Return

3/27/2018: Writ - Return

Writ of (name extension) - Possession: Mailed

3/1/2018: Writ of (name extension) - Possession: Mailed

Judgment - Unlawful Detainer

2/14/2018: Judgment - Unlawful Detainer

Notice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order

2/14/2018: Notice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order

Certificate of Mailing for - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 02/14/2018

2/14/2018: Certificate of Mailing for - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 02/14/2018

Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

2/14/2018: Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

1/26/2018: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Proof of Personal Service

1/26/2018: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

1/26/2018: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Request/Counter-Request To Set Case For Trial

1/26/2018: Request/Counter-Request To Set Case For Trial

Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

1/4/2018: Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

Summons - on Complaint

12/21/2017: Summons - on Complaint

Complaint

12/21/2017: Complaint

Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - (ALL OCCUPANTS)

12/22/2017: Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - (ALL OCCUPANTS)

Property Owner/Landlord Only Hearing Notice

12/21/2017: Property Owner/Landlord Only Hearing Notice

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

12/21/2017: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/27/2018
  • Writ - Return ( Wholly Satisfied);; Costs Credits: 0.00; Interest Credits: 0.00; Principal Credits: 0.00; Possession: Yes; Judgment Satisfaction Type: Wholly Satisfied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2018
  • Ex Parte Application For Order Staying Execution of The Judgment And Granting Additional Time To Relocate; Memorandum of Points and Authorities And Declaration In Support Thereof; Filed by: Deroy Green (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2018
  • Hearing on Ex Parte Application For Order Staying Execution of The Judgment scheduled for 03/15/2018 at 01:30 PM in West Covina Courthouse at Department 6

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2018
  • Minute Order (Hearing on Ex Parte Application For Order Staying Execution o...)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2018
  • Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Hearing on Ex Parte Application For Order Staying Execution o...) of 03/15/2018; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2018
  • Updated -- Ex Parte Application For Order Staying Execution of The Judgment And Granting Additional Time To Relocate; Memorandum of Points and Authorities And Declaration In Support Thereof: Result: Denied; Result Date: 03/15/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2018
  • Hearing on Ex Parte Application For Order Staying Execution of The Judgment scheduled for 03/15/2018 at 01:30 PM in West Covina Courthouse at Department 6 updated: Result Date to 03/15/2018; Result Type to Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2018
  • Application for Writ of Possession; Filed by: Muriel N. Weber (Plaintiff); Daily Rental Value: 32.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2018
  • Writ of Possession: Mailed; Issued by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2018
  • Order to Show Cause - Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 03/05/2018 at 08:30 AM in West Covina Courthouse at Civil Clerk's Office Not Held - Vacated by Court on 02/23/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
14 More Docket Entries
  • 01/04/2018
  • Answer; Filed by: Deroy Green (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2018
  • Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Signed and Filed by: Clerk; As to: Deroy Green (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2017
  • Notice of Unlawful Detainer mailed 12/22/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2017
  • Complaint; Filed by: Muriel N. Weber (Plaintiff); As to: Deroy Green (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2017
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Muriel N. Weber (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2017
  • Summons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2017
  • Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2017
  • Property Owner/Landlord Only Hearing Notice; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2017
  • Case assigned to Hon. Susan J. Townsend in Department 6 West Covina Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2017
  • Order to Show Cause - Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 03/05/2018 at 08:30 AM in West Covina Courthouse at Civil Clerk's Office

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer LONG HELEN GRAYCE