Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/20/2021 at 00:08:29 (UTC).

MUHAMMAD ARSHAD VS RAMON DIEGO MARCOA MATEO, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 09/19/2019 MUHAMMAD ARSHAD filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against RAMON DIEGO MARCOA MATEO. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is JAMES E. BLANCARTE. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******8674

  • Filing Date:

    09/19/2019

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

JAMES E. BLANCARTE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ARSHAD MUHAMMAD

Defendants

MATEO RAMON DIEGO MARCOA

MATEO DIEGO DOMINGO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

TRIVEDI SAM

Defendant Attorney

DACEY JENNIFER M.

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

7/10/2020: Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

Answer - Answer

11/22/2019: Answer - Answer

Demand for Jury Trial - Demand for Jury Trial

11/22/2019: Demand for Jury Trial - Demand for Jury Trial

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

9/19/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - Summons on Complaint

9/19/2019: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Complaint - Complaint

9/19/2019: Complaint - Complaint

First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

9/19/2019: First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

9/19/2019: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/15/2020
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 03/18/2021 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 07/15/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 09/22/2022 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 07/15/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by Muhammad Arshad on 09/19/2019, entered Request for Dismissal with prejudice filed by Muhammad Arshad as to the entire action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • DocketAddress for Sam Trivedi (Attorney) null

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial; Filed by: Ramon Diego Marcoa Mateo (Defendant); Domingo Marcos Diego Erroneously Sued As Diego Domingo Mateo (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: Ramon Diego Marcoa Mateo (Defendant); Domingo Marcos Diego Erroneously Sued As Diego Domingo Mateo (Defendant); As to: Muhammad Arshad (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2019
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 03/18/2021 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2019
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 09/22/2022 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2019
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. James E. Blancarte in Department 94 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Muhammad Arshad (Plaintiff); As to: Ramon Diego Marcoa Mateo (Defendant); Diego Domingo Mateo (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2019
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Muhammad Arshad (Plaintiff); As to: Ramon Diego Marcoa Mateo (Defendant); Diego Domingo Mateo (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Muhammad Arshad (Plaintiff); As to: Ramon Diego Marcoa Mateo (Defendant); Diego Domingo Mateo (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2019
  • DocketFirst Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less