This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/22/2019 at 14:25:16 (UTC).

M&S CLASSIC STONE, INC. VS BRUCE HALPRIN, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 04/18/2019 M S CLASSIC STONE, INC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against BRUCE HALPRIN. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is WENDY CHANG. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3830

  • Filing Date:

    04/18/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

WENDY CHANG

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

M&S CLASSIC STONE INC.

Defendants

4146 BECK AVENUE LLC

HALPRIN BRUCE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PAUL CHRISTIAN FREDERICK

 

Court Documents

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Order to Show Cause Re: status of Plaintiffs legal represent...) of 12/09/2019

12/9/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Order to Show Cause Re: status of Plaintiffs legal represent...) of 12/09/2019

Minute Order - Minute Order (Order to Show Cause Re: status of Plaintiffs legal represent...)

12/9/2019: Minute Order - Minute Order (Order to Show Cause Re: status of Plaintiffs legal represent...)

Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to be Relieved as Counsel)

11/4/2019: Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to be Relieved as Counsel)

Proof of Service by Mail - Proof of Service by Mail

11/15/2019: Proof of Service by Mail - Proof of Service by Mail

Notice of Ruling - Notice of Ruling

11/15/2019: Notice of Ruling - Notice of Ruling

Order Granting Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil - Order Granting Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil

11/4/2019: Order Granting Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil - Order Granting Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil

Declaration in Support of Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil - Declaration in Support of Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil

9/18/2019: Declaration in Support of Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil - Declaration in Support of Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil

Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel - Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel

9/18/2019: Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel - Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

6/25/2019: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Proof of Service by Mail - Proof of Service by Mail Amended

7/8/2019: Proof of Service by Mail - Proof of Service by Mail Amended

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

5/13/2019: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

5/13/2019: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

4/18/2019: First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

4/18/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint - Complaint

4/18/2019: Complaint - Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

4/18/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

4/18/2019: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Summons - Summons on Complaint

4/18/2019: Summons - Summons on Complaint

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/09/2019
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by M&S Classic Stone, Inc. on 04/18/2019, entered Order for Dismissal without prejudice as to the entire action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • DocketMinute Order (Order to Show Cause Re: status of Plaintiff?s legal represent...)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Order to Show Cause Re: status of Plaintiff?s legal represent...) of 12/09/2019; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: status of Plaintiff?s legal representation scheduled for 12/09/2019 at 10:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94 updated: Result Date to 12/09/2019; Result Type to Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 10/15/2020 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 12/09/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 04/21/2022 at 10:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 12/09/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: status of Plaintiff?s legal representation scheduled for 12/09/2019 at 10:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2019
  • DocketNotice of Ruling; Filed by: M&S Classic Stone, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2019
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail; Filed by: M&S Classic Stone, Inc. (Plaintiff); As to: M&S Classic Stone, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2019
  • DocketUpdated -- Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel: Filed By: M&S Classic Stone, Inc. (Plaintiff); Result: Granted; Result Date: 11/04/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
11 More Docket Entries
  • 05/13/2019
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: M&S Classic Stone, Inc. (Plaintiff); As to: 4146 Beck Avenue, LLC (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 05/08/2019; Service Cost: 90.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2019
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 10/15/2020 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2019
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 04/21/2022 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2019
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Wendy Chang in Department 94 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: M&S Classic Stone, Inc. (Plaintiff); As to: Bruce Halprin (Defendant); 4146 Beck Avenue, LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: M&S Classic Stone, Inc. (Plaintiff); As to: Bruce Halprin (Defendant); 4146 Beck Avenue, LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2019
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: M&S Classic Stone, Inc. (Plaintiff); As to: Bruce Halprin (Defendant); 4146 Beck Avenue, LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: M&S Classic Stone, Inc. (Plaintiff); As to: Bruce Halprin (Defendant); 4146 Beck Avenue, LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2019
  • DocketFirst Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: 19STLC03830    Hearing Date: November 04, 2019    Dept: 94

MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL

(CCP § 284(2); CRC Rule 3.1362)

TENTATIVE RULING

Motion of Attorney Jeremy J. Alberts, Esq. for BWA Law Group, LLC to withdraw as counsel for Plaintiff M&S Classic Stone, Inc. is GRANTED. Order effective upon filing of proof of service of the order granting the motion on all parties.

OSC re status of Plaintiff’s legal representation set for December 9, 2019 at 10:30 am in Department 94.

Moving party to give notice to client and all parties.