This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/25/2021 at 00:15:15 (UTC).

MOUNTAIN RECOVERY, LLC VS JACOBO ALCANTARA, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 05/23/2019 MOUNTAIN RECOVERY, LLC filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against JACOBO ALCANTARA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is WENDY CHANG. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5040

  • Filing Date:

    05/23/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

WENDY CHANG

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MOUNTAIN RECOVERY LLC

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

GUTIERREZ ROGELIO PINON

MARROQUIN JOSE MORAGA

ALCANTARA JACOBO

ALCANTARA ANA JACOBO

Defendants and Cross Defendants

MARROQUIN JOSE MORAGA

ALCANTARA JACOBO

ALCANTARA ANA JACOBO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

TUCKER VERNON C. ESQ.

TUCKER VERNON C.

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

HAGEMANN KENNETH

HAGEMANN KENNETH ALLEN ESQ.

 

Court Documents

Notice (name extension) - Notice of Ruling and Trial Continuance

11/20/2020: Notice (name extension) - Notice of Ruling and Trial Continuance

Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to Deem Request for Admissions Admitted)

1/11/2021: Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to Deem Request for Admissions Admitted)

Request for Judicial Notice - Request for Judicial Notice

8/13/2021: Request for Judicial Notice - Request for Judicial Notice

Order - Dismissal - Order - Dismissal

8/23/2021: Order - Dismissal - Order - Dismissal

Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment - Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

10/2/2020: Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment - Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

10/2/2020: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Motion in Limine (name extension) - Motion in Limine Motion in Limine to Preclude Plaintiff from Introducing any Witnesses or Evidence in the Trial of this Matter

11/17/2020: Motion in Limine (name extension) - Motion in Limine Motion in Limine to Preclude Plaintiff from Introducing any Witnesses or Evidence in the Trial of this Matter

Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

11/19/2020: Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to Compel Discovery (not "Further Discovery"))

1/13/2020: Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to Compel Discovery (not "Further Discovery"))

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) - Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

1/14/2020: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) - Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to Compel Discovery (not "Further Discovery"))

10/22/2019: Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to Compel Discovery (not "Further Discovery"))

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Hearing on Motion to Compel Discovery (not "Further Discovery")) of 10/22/2019

10/22/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Hearing on Motion to Compel Discovery (not "Further Discovery")) of 10/22/2019

Motion to Compel Discovery (not Further Discovery) - 1 moving party, 1 motion - Motion to Compel Discovery (not Further Discovery) - 1 moving party, 1 motion

8/28/2019: Motion to Compel Discovery (not Further Discovery) - 1 moving party, 1 motion - Motion to Compel Discovery (not Further Discovery) - 1 moving party, 1 motion

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees - Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

8/7/2019: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees - Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Summons - Summons on Cross-Complaint

8/13/2019: Summons - Summons on Cross-Complaint

Cross-Complaint - Cross-Complaint

8/13/2019: Cross-Complaint - Cross-Complaint

Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

6/21/2019: Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

5/23/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

33 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/23/2021
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by MOUNTAIN RECOVERY, LLC on 05/23/2019, entered Order for Dismissal without prejudice as to the entire action, pursuant to CCP 581(b)(5)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • DocketOn the Cross-Complaint filed by ROGELIO PINON GUTIERREZ on 08/13/2019, entered Order for Dismissal without prejudice as to the entire action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • DocketOrder - Dismissal; Issued and Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • DocketMinute Order (Non-Jury Trial;)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial;) of 08/23/2021; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • DocketUpdated -- Kenneth Allen Hagemann, Esq. (Attorney): Organization Name changed from Law Offices of Richardson, Fair & Cohen to Richardson, Fair & Cohen; Name Suffix: Esq. Middle Name: Allen

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • DocketAddress for Kenneth Allen Hagemann, Esq. (Attorney) updated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • DocketUpdated -- Vernon C. Tucker, Esq. (Attorney): Name Suffix: Esq.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • DocketAddress for Vernon C. Tucker, Esq. (Attorney) updated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 08/23/2021 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26 Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court on 08/23/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
55 More Docket Entries
  • 06/21/2019
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: MOUNTAIN RECOVERY, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: JOSE MORAGA MARROQUIN (Defendant); Service Date: 06/20/2019; Service Cost: 120.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2019
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: MOUNTAIN RECOVERY, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: JACOBO ALCANTARA (Defendant); Service Date: 06/20/2019; Service Cost: 120.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2019
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 11/19/2020 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2019
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 05/26/2022 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2019
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Wendy Chang in Department 94 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: MOUNTAIN RECOVERY, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: JACOBO ALCANTARA (Defendant); ROGELIO PINON GUTIERREZ (Defendant); JOSE MORAGA MARROQUIN (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2019
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: MOUNTAIN RECOVERY, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: JACOBO ALCANTARA (Defendant); ROGELIO PINON GUTIERREZ (Defendant); JOSE MORAGA MARROQUIN (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: MOUNTAIN RECOVERY, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: JACOBO ALCANTARA (Defendant); ROGELIO PINON GUTIERREZ (Defendant); JOSE MORAGA MARROQUIN (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2019
  • DocketFirst Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: 19STLC05040    Hearing Date: January 11, 2021    Dept: 26

MOTION TO DEEM REQUESTS FOR ADMISSION ADMITTED

(CCP § 2033.280)

TENTATIVE RULING:

No Tentative.  Court to inquire at hearing.

Case Number: 19STLC05040    Hearing Date: January 13, 2020    Dept: 94

TENTATIVE RULING:

Plaintiff Mountain Recovery, LLC’s Motion Compelling Defendant Jose Moraga Marroquin To Respond To Form Interrogatories, Set One, is GRANTED.

ANALYSIS:

On November 26, 2019, Plaintiff filed a second Motion to Compel Defendant Marroquin’s Responses to Form Interrogatories and Request for Sanctions. The second Motion, therefore, is a renewed Motion under Code of Civil Procedure section 1008, subdivision (b). A renewed motion under Code of Civil Procedure section 1008, subdivision (b) seeks the same relief that was previously denied. Here, Defendants do not seek to amend, modify or revoke the court’s October 22, 2019 order. Rather, they seek the same relief as before.

When a motion has been denied in whole or in part, the moving party may apply again for the same relief at a later time only upon “new or different facts, circumstances or law.” (Code Civ. Proc., § 1008, subd. (b); see Graham v. Hansen (1982) 128 Cal.App.3d 965, 969-970.) The motion must be supported by a declaration showing the previous order, by which judge it was made, and what new or different facts, circumstances or law are claimed to exist. (Code Civ. Proc., § 1008, subd. (b).) Unlike a motion for reconsideration, there is no time limit under subdivision (b) for the renewal of a previous motion. (See Stephen v. Enterprise Rent-A-Car of San Francisco (1991) 235 Cal.App.3d 806, 816.)

The second Motion to Compel Defendant Marroquin’s responses to Form Interrogatories and for Sanctions is not accompanied by a declaration showing the previous order, by which judge it was made, and what new or different facts, circumstances or law are claimed to exist. (See Motion, Tucker Decl.) Nor does the second Motion explain under what “new or different facts, circumstances or law it is brought.”

However, the Court may reconsider its prior interim orders upon its own motion. (Le Francois v. Goel (2005) 35 Cal.4th 1094, 1106.) Here, the Court reconsiders its prior order denying the first Motion to Compel Defendant Marroquin’s responses to Form Interrogatories and for Sanctions. The first Motion was denied on the grounds that no proof of service was attached and that default had been entered against Defendant Marroquin. Default, however, was entered against Defendant Marroquin only on the Cross-Complaint filed by Defendant/Cross-Complainant Gutierrez. That default has no bearing on a discovery motion brought by Plaintiff. Furthermore, Plaintiff has since given proper notice of the instant motion. (Motion, Proof of Service.)

Defendant Marroquin has not provided any responses to the interrogatories propounded by Plaintiff on July 21, 2019. (Motion, Tucker Decl., ¶3 and Exh. A.) There is no requirement for a prior meet and confer effort before a motion to compel initial responses can be filed. Further, the motion can be brought any time after the responding party fails to provide the responses. Based on the foregoing, Plaintiff is entitled to an order that Defendant Marroquin serve verified responses to the Form Interrogatories, Set One, without objections. The responses are due within 20 days’ notice of this order.

The court also finds Defendant Marroquin’s failure to respond a misuse of the discovery process. (Code Civ. Proc., § 2023.010, subd. (d).) Sanctions are appropriate under Code of Civil Procedure sections 2023.010 and 2023.030, and have been properly noticed. The request for sanctions is granted against Defendant Marroquin in the amount of $560.00 based on two hours of attorney time billed at $250.00 per hour. (Motion, Tucker Decl., ¶5.) The sanctions are to be paid within 30 days’ notice of this order.

Moving party to give notice.

related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MOUNTAIN RECOVERY LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer HAGEMANN KENNETH