This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/18/2021 at 05:28:39 (UTC).

MOUNTAIN RECOVERY, LLC VS EDGAR ARTURO FLORES SANCHEZ

Case Summary

On 01/29/2020 MOUNTAIN RECOVERY, LLC filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against EDGAR ARTURO FLORES SANCHEZ. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is SERENA R. MURILLO. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0957

  • Filing Date:

    01/29/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

SERENA R. MURILLO

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MOUNTAIN RECOVERY LLC

Defendant

FLORES SANCHEZ EDGAR ARTURO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

TUCKER VERNON C.

 

Court Documents

First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

1/29/2020: First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

1/29/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Complaint - Complaint

1/29/2020: Complaint - Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

1/29/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - Summons on Complaint

1/29/2020: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

2/6/2020: Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

2/6/2020: Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment - Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

4/10/2020: Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment - Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

4/14/2020: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial;)

7/28/2021: Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial;)

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial;) of 07/28/2021

7/28/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial;) of 07/28/2021

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order - Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

10/12/2021: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order - Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/22/2021
  • Hearing12/22/2021 at 09:30 AM in Department 26 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: (name extension)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • DocketNotice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • DocketReset - Court Unavailable, Order to Show Cause Re: Entry of Default Judgment or Dismissal scheduled for 11/15/2021 at 09:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26 Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court was rescheduled to 12/22/2021 09:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 02/01/2023 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26 Not Held - Advanced and Vacated on 02/06/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Entry of Default Judgment or Dismissal scheduled for 11/15/2021 at 09:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2021
  • DocketMinute Order (Non-Jury Trial;)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial;) of 07/28/2021; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2021
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 07/28/2021 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26 Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court on 07/28/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2020
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by: Mountain Recovery, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Edgar Arturo Flores Sanchez (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2020
  • DocketDefault entered as to Edgar Arturo Flores Sanchez; On the Complaint filed by Mountain Recovery, LLC on 01/29/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 02/06/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Mountain Recovery, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Edgar Arturo Flores Sanchez (Defendant); Service Date: 02/05/2020; Service Cost: 120.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Mountain Recovery, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Edgar Arturo Flores Sanchez (Defendant); Service Date: 02/05/2020; Service Cost: 120.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 07/28/2021 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 02/01/2023 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Serena R. Murillo in Department 26 Spring Street Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Mountain Recovery, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Edgar Arturo Flores Sanchez (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Mountain Recovery, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Edgar Arturo Flores Sanchez (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Mountain Recovery, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Edgar Arturo Flores Sanchez (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • DocketFirst Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MOUNTAIN RECOVERY LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer TUCKER VERNON C.