This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/08/2019 at 15:10:27 (UTC).

MOUNTAIN LION ACQUISITIONS, IN VS CONCEPCION, ELISA L

Case Summary

On 06/06/2016 MOUNTAIN LION ACQUISITIONS, IN filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against CONCEPCION, ELISA L. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Norwalk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is JOSEPH R. PORRAS. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****9255

  • Filing Date:

    06/06/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Norwalk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

JOSEPH R. PORRAS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MOUNTAIN LION ACQUISITIONS INC

Defendant

CONCEPCION ELISA L

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

ATTORNEY AT LAW - D. SCOTT CARRUTHERS

Attorney at ATTORNEY AT LAW

CARRUTHERS D. SCOTT

 

Court Documents

Writ - Return - (UNSATISFIED)

9/7/2018: Writ - Return - (UNSATISFIED)

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/04/2018
  • Updated -- Writ - Return (UNSATISFIED): As To Parties: removed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2018
  • Writ - Return (UNSATISFIED) ( ); Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2017
  • WRIT OF EXECUTION ISSUED TO LOS ANGELES COUNTY ON BEHALF OF (MOUNTAIN LION ACQUISITIONS, INC) , RECEIPT NO. NOR183318008 . ABC LEGAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2017
  • MEMORANDUM OF COSTS IN THE SUM OF $ 58.00 FILED BY PLAINTIFF .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2017
  • DECLARATION RE: ACCRUED INTEREST FILED, $ 560.50 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2017
  • REJECT SHEET SENT TO (MOUNTAIN LION ACQUISITIONS, INC) FOR REJECTION OF WRIT OF EXECUTION/LINE#11 INCORRECT TOTAL AMOUNT OF JUDGMENT MEMO OF COSTS/LINE #1A THERE IS NO INCURRED DATE, PLEASE REVISE RESUBMIT, THE WRIT FEE OF $25.00 HAS BEEN APPLIED NOR183318008 SUBMITTED ON 05/11/17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2017
  • ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT ISSUED. SASE, MT. . RECEIPT # NOR467231076 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2017
  • JUDGMENT DEFAULT BY CLERK ENTERED AS FOLLOWS:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2017
  • JUDGMENT ENTERED AS A FINAL DISPOSITION ON 02/10/17 . FOR (MOUNTAIN LION ACQUISITIONS, INC) . AGAINST (CONCEPCION, ELISA L) . PRINCIPAL $ 3854.75 . ATTORNEY FEES $ 321.28 . INTEREST $ 10758.78 . COSTS $ 246.00 . TOTAL $ 15,180.81 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2017
  • REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT RECEIVED AS TO (CONCEPCION, ELISA L) .

    Read MoreRead Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 11/07/2016
  • DECLARATION RE: ANDY MAXWELL SUPPORT OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT 585(B) FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2016
  • REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT RECEIVED AS TO (CONCEPCION, ELISA L) .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2016
  • PROOF OF SERVICE RE: SUMMONS; COMPLAINT; CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET & ADDENDUM; FILED. SERVED AS TO (CONCEPCION, ELISA L) SUBSERVED BY LEAVING WITH ALBERTO CONCEPCION ON 07/16/16 . COSTS OF $ 65.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2016
  • SERVICE RE: SUMMONS & COMPLAINT; CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET & ADDENDUM; RETURNED NOT FOUND/NO SERVICE AS TO (CONCEPCION, ELISA L) FILED. COSTS OF $ 65.00 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2016
  • SERVICE RE: SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT RETURNED NOT FOUND/NO SERVICE AS TO (CONCEPCION, ELISA L) FILED. COSTS OF $ 65.00 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2016
  • COLLECTIONS CASE COMPLAINT FILED PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740. RN NOR265476084. Filing Fee: 181.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2016
  • SUMMONS ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2016
  • SUMMONS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2016
  • DECLARATION UNDER BUSINESS AND PROFESSIONS CODE 6322.1 FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2016
  • OSC HEARING IS SET FOR 05/22/19 AT 08:30A M., IN DEPARTMENT SEY . ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING SIGNED AND FILED BY JOSEPH R. PORRAS, JUDGE TO SHOW WHY SANCTIONS SHOULD NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE AND FAILURE TO FILE DEFAULT JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740. CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less