Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/19/2019 at 01:03:43 (UTC).

MOUNT WILSON FM BROADCASTERS INC. VS NISSANI BROTHERS AUTO MALL

Case Summary

On 01/26/2018 MOUNT WILSON FM BROADCASTERS INC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against NISSANI BROTHERS AUTO MALL. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are ELAINE LU and ERNEST M. HIROSHIGE. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0321

  • Filing Date:

    01/26/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judges

ELAINE LU

ERNEST M. HIROSHIGE

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

MOUNT WILSON FM BROADCASTERS INC.

MOUNT WILSON FM BROADCASTERS INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Defendant

NISSANI BROTHERS AUTO MALL AKA NISSANI BROS. AUTO MALL AKA NISSANI BROS. AUTOMOTIVE GROUP AKA HOOMAN AUTOMOTIVE GROUP AKA HOOMAN CHEVY AKA HOOMAN CHEVROLET OF CULVER CITY AKA NISSANI BROTHERS CHEVROLET AKA NISSANI BROS CHEVROLET AKA NISSANI BROS.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

IEZZA NICOLINO IRENIO

Attorney at Spiwak & Iezza, LLP

555 Marin St Ste 140

Thousand Oaks, CA 91360

Defendant Attorney

MCCREARY DUNCAN JAMES

 

Court Documents

Writ - Return - Writ - Return

10/10/2019: Writ - Return - Writ - Return

Exhibit List - Exhibit List

10/15/2019: Exhibit List - Exhibit List

Trial Brief - Trial Brief

10/15/2019: Trial Brief - Trial Brief

Witness List - Witness List

10/15/2019: Witness List - Witness List

Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

10/17/2019: Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

Stipulation and Order (name extension) - Joint Stipulation and Order to Continue Trial and Attendant Dates

7/26/2019: Stipulation and Order (name extension) - Joint Stipulation and Order to Continue Trial and Attendant Dates

Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

7/26/2019: Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

Other - (name extension) - Other - Decision on application for right to attach order: granted

5/30/2019: Other - (name extension) - Other - Decision on application for right to attach order: granted

Ex Parte Right to Attach Order and Order for Issuance of Writ of Attachment (Resident) - Ex Parte Right to Attach Order and Order for Issuance of Writ of Attachment (Resident)

2/7/2019: Ex Parte Right to Attach Order and Order for Issuance of Writ of Attachment (Resident) - Ex Parte Right to Attach Order and Order for Issuance of Writ of Attachment (Resident)

Application for Right to Attach Order, Temporary Protective Order, etc. - Application for Right to Attach Order, Temporary Protective Order, etc.

3/21/2019: Application for Right to Attach Order, Temporary Protective Order, etc. - Application for Right to Attach Order, Temporary Protective Order, etc.

Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Ex Parte Application Right to Attach Order and Ord...)

2/11/2019: Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Ex Parte Application Right to Attach Order and Ord...)

Memorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest - Memorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest

9/19/2018: Memorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest - Memorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest

Reply (name extension) - Reply to opposition

12/31/2018: Reply (name extension) - Reply to opposition

Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Ex Parte Application to set aside default)

11/5/2018: Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Ex Parte Application to set aside default)

Request for Dismissal

8/1/2018: Request for Dismissal

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

7/11/2018: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Proof of Personal Service - (Amended)

6/8/2018: Proof of Personal Service - (Amended)

Civil Case Cover Sheet

1/26/2018: Civil Case Cover Sheet

49 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/18/2019
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 10/18/2019 at 09:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 54

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2019
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by Mount Wilson FM Broadcasters Inc. on 01/26/2018, entered Order for Dismissal without prejudice as to the entire action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2019
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 10/17/2019 at 11:00 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 54 Held - Continued was rescheduled to 10/18/2019 09:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2019
  • DocketMinute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2019
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 10/18/2019 at 09:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 54 updated: Result Date to 10/18/2019; Result Type to Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2019
  • DocketThis case is assigned to Judge Ernest M. Hiroshige in Department 54 at Stanley Mosk Courthouse for trial purposes only.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2019
  • DocketOther - Election to Forgo Affidavit (CCP 170.6) as to Judge Hiroshige; Filed by: Mount Wilson FM Broadcasters Inc. A California Corporation (Plaintiff); Nissani Brothers Auto Mall (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2019
  • DocketLimited Jurisdiction Trial Transfer Order to Judge Hiroshige, Dept. 54, Central, OTR today at 11:00 a.m. Signed and Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2019
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 10/17/2019 at 11:00 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 54

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2019
  • DocketMinute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
84 More Docket Entries
  • 05/01/2018
  • Docket; Default not entered as to Nissani Brothers Auto Mall; On the Complaint filed by Mount Wilson FM Broadcasters Inc. on 01/26/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2018
  • DocketCase reassigned to Stanley Mosk Courthouse in Department 77

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2018
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Mount Wilson FM Broadcasters Inc. (Plaintiff); As to: Nissani Brothers Auto Mall (Defendant); Service Date: 01/31/2018; Service Cost: 120.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2018
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Elaine Lu in Department 77 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2018
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 07/26/2019 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 77

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2018
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 01/29/2021 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 77

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Mount Wilson FM Broadcasters Inc. (Plaintiff); As to: Nissani Brothers Auto Mall (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2018
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Mount Wilson FM Broadcasters Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2018
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2018
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: 18STLC00321    Hearing Date: March 03, 2021    Dept: 26

Mount Wilson FM Broadcasters, Inc. v. Nissani Brothers Auto Mall, et al.

MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL

(CCP § 284(2); CRC Rule 3.1362)

TENTATIVE RULING

Nick Iezza, Esq. of Spiwak & Iezza’s Motion to Withdraw as Counsel for Plaintiff Mount Wilson FM Broadcasters, Inc. is CONTINUED TO MAY 5, 2021 AT 9:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 26 IN THE SPRING STREET COURTHOUSE. PROOF OF SERVICE OF ALL MOVING PAPERS ON ALL PARTIES MUST BE FILED AT LEAST 16 COURT DAYS PRIOR TO NEW HEARING DATE.

Court clerk to give notice.

related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MOUNT WILSON FM BROADCASTERS INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where HOLMAN AUTOMOBILE GROUP, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer IEZZA NICOLINO IRENIO