This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/24/2021 at 18:04:26 (UTC).

MOUNT WILSON FM BROADCASTERS, INC. VS AIMBRIDGE HOSPITALITY, LLC

Case Summary

On 12/30/2020 MOUNT WILSON FM BROADCASTERS, INC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against AIMBRIDGE HOSPITALITY, LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Santa Monica Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2084

  • Filing Date:

    12/30/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MOUNT WILSON FM BROADCASTERS INC.

Defendant

AIMBRIDGE HOSPITALITY LLC

 

Court Documents

Request for Court Order and Answer - Request for Court Order and Answer

2/19/2021: Request for Court Order and Answer - Request for Court Order and Answer

Order on Request for Court Order - Order on Request for Court Order

4/5/2021: Order on Request for Court Order - Order on Request for Court Order

Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

4/13/2021: Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 04/13/2021

4/13/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 04/13/2021

Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service) - Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service)

4/1/2021: Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service) - Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service)

Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) - Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) Mark Frances/SVP, Operations

4/9/2021: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) - Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) Mark Frances/SVP, Operations

Proof of Service Not Plaintiffs / Defendants Claim - Proof of Service Not Plaintiffs / Defendants Claim

4/13/2021: Proof of Service Not Plaintiffs / Defendants Claim - Proof of Service Not Plaintiffs / Defendants Claim

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Notice Notice of Online Dispute Resolution Meet and Confer]

2/26/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Notice Notice of Online Dispute Resolution Meet and Confer]

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

12/30/2020: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Attachment, Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court]

12/30/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Attachment, Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court]

Attachment - Attachment

12/30/2020: Attachment - Attachment

Attachment - Attachment

1/4/2021: Attachment - Attachment

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Certificate of Mailing for [Attachment, Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court], Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Cl

1/4/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Certificate of Mailing for [Attachment, Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court], Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Cl

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/22/2021
  • DocketUpdated -- Request for Court Order and Answer: Document changed from Order on Request for Court Order to Request for Court Order and Answer; As To Parties changed from Aimbridge Hospitality, LLC (Defendant) to Aimbridge Hospitality, LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • DocketProof of Service Not Plaintiff?s / Defendant?s Claim; Filed by: As to: Mount Wilson FM Broadcasters, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • DocketOn the Plaintiff's Claim filed by Mount Wilson FM Broadcasters, Inc. on 12/30/2020, entered Order for Dismissal without prejudice as to the entire action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • DocketMinute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 04/13/2021; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 04/13/2021 at 10:00 AM in Santa Monica Courthouse at Department S updated: Result Date to 04/13/2021; Result Type to Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • DocketAuthorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) Mark Frances/SVP, Operations; Filed by: Aimbridge Hospitality, LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • DocketOrder on Request for Court Order; Filed by: As to: Aimbridge Hospitality, LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • DocketProof of Mailing (Substituted Service); Filed by: Aimbridge Hospitality, LLC (Defendant); Mailing Date: 02/19/2021; Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • DocketUpdated -- Order on Request for Court Order: As To Parties changed from Aimbridge Hospitality, LLC (Defendant) to Aimbridge Hospitality, LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • DocketNotice Notice of Online Dispute Resolution Meet and Confer; Issued by: Clerk; As to: Mount Wilson FM Broadcasters, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for [Notice Notice of Online Dispute Resolution Meet and Confer]; Issued and Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • DocketRequest for Court Order and Answer; Filed by: Clerk; As to: Aimbridge Hospitality, LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2021
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 04/13/2021 at 10:00 AM in Santa Monica Courthouse at Department S

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2021
  • DocketAttachment; Issued and Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for [Certificate of Mailing for [Attachment, Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court], Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court]; Issued by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2020
  • DocketAttachment; Issued and Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for [Attachment, Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court]; Issued by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2020
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Mount Wilson FM Broadcasters, Inc. (Plaintiff); As to: Aimbridge Hospitality, LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Lisa K Sepe-Wiesenfeld in Department S Santa Monica Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MOUNT WILSON FM BROADCASTERS INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where AIMBRIDGE HOSPITALITY, LLC is a litigant