This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/19/2020 at 04:44:02 (UTC).

MOTTER ENTERPRISES, INC. VS RODOLFO CAMPOS

Case Summary

On 12/04/2019 MOTTER ENTERPRISES, INC filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against RODOLFO CAMPOS. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Chatsworth Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is TRICIA TAYLOR. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1787

  • Filing Date:

    12/04/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

TRICIA TAYLOR

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MOTTER ENTERPRISES INC.

Defendant

CAMPOS RODOLFO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

FEINBERG LAURENCE

 

Court Documents

Writ - Return - Writ - Return

1/30/2020: Writ - Return - Writ - Return

Writ of (name extension) - Writ of Possession

1/10/2020: Writ of (name extension) - Writ of Possession

Application for Writ of Possession - Application for Writ of Possession

1/9/2020: Application for Writ of Possession - Application for Writ of Possession

Judgment - Unlawful Detainer - Judgment - Unlawful Detainer

1/8/2020: Judgment - Unlawful Detainer - Judgment - Unlawful Detainer

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

1/6/2020: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

1/6/2020: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

1/6/2020: Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

1/6/2020: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) (RODOLFO CAMPOS)

12/5/2019: Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) (RODOLFO CAMPOS)

Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) (ALL OCCUPANTS)

12/5/2019: Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) (ALL OCCUPANTS)

Complaint - Complaint

12/4/2019: Complaint - Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

12/4/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Property Owner/Landlord Only Hearing Notice - Property Owner/Landlord Only Hearing Notice

12/4/2019: Property Owner/Landlord Only Hearing Notice - Property Owner/Landlord Only Hearing Notice

Summons - Summons on Complaint

12/4/2019: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

12/4/2019: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/30/2020
  • DocketWrit - Return ( Unsatisfied);; Costs Credits: 0.00; Interest Credits: 0.00; Principal Credits: 0.00; Possession: Yes; Judgment Satisfaction Type: Unsatisfied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2020
  • DocketWrit of Possession; Issued by: MOTTER ENTERPRISES, INC. (Plaintiff); As to: RODOLFO CAMPOS (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • DocketApplication for Writ of Possession; Filed by: MOTTER ENTERPRISES, INC. (Plaintiff); Daily Rental Value: 56.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • DocketDefault judgment by Clerk entered for Plaintiff MOTTER ENTERPRISES, INC. against Defendant RODOLFO CAMPOS on the Complaint filed by MOTTER ENTERPRISES, INC. on 12/04/2019 for a total of $0.00.; Judgment for possession is granted against all unnamed occupants pursuant to Code of Civil Procedure section 415.46.; Restitution and possession of the premises located at 16930 Blackhawk Street #03, Granada Hills, CA 91344 is granted for plaintiff(s)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • DocketJudgment - Unlawful Detainer; Filed by: MOTTER ENTERPRISES, INC. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 02/19/2020 at 08:30 AM in Chatsworth Courthouse at Civil Clerk's Office Not Held - Vacated by Court on 01/08/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: MOTTER ENTERPRISES, INC. (Plaintiff); As to: RODOLFO CAMPOS (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 12/15/2019; Service Cost: 60.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: MOTTER ENTERPRISES, INC. (Plaintiff); As to: Unnamed Occupants; Proof of Mailing Date: 12/15/2019; Service Cost: 40.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by: MOTTER ENTERPRISES, INC. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • DocketDefault entered as to RODOLFO CAMPOS; unnamed occupants pursuant to CCP 415.46; On the Complaint filed by MOTTER ENTERPRISES, INC. on 12/04/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by MOTTER ENTERPRISES, INC. on 12/04/2019, entered Request for Dismissal without prejudice filed by MOTTER ENTERPRISES, INC., does 1-10

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by: MOTTER ENTERPRISES, INC. (Plaintiff); As to: Unnamed Occupants; RODOLFO CAMPOS (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • DocketNotice of Unlawful Detainer mailed 12/05/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: MOTTER ENTERPRISES, INC. (Plaintiff); As to: RODOLFO CAMPOS (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: MOTTER ENTERPRISES, INC. (Plaintiff); As to: RODOLFO CAMPOS (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: MOTTER ENTERPRISES, INC. (Plaintiff); As to: RODOLFO CAMPOS (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • DocketProperty Owner/Landlord Only Hearing Notice; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 02/19/2020 at 08:30 AM in Chatsworth Courthouse at Civil Clerk's Office

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Tricia Taylor in Department F44 Chatsworth Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MOTTER ENTERPRISES INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer FEINBERG LAURENCE JAY