This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/19/2020 at 14:07:07 (UTC).

MORTGAGE LENDER SERVICES, INC. VS GRACE R. RUBILOTTA

Case Summary

On 03/06/2019 MORTGAGE LENDER SERVICES, INC filed an Other lawsuit against GRACE R RUBILOTTA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is WENDY CHANG. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0712

  • Filing Date:

    03/06/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

WENDY CHANG

 

Party Details

Petitioner

MORTGAGE LENDER SERVICES INC.

Respondent

RUBILOTTA GRACE R.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

SILVERMAN TIMOTHY

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Petition Petition and Declaration Regarding Unreso...)

9/11/2019: Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Petition Petition and Declaration Regarding Unreso...)

Notice (name extension) - Notice NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER AND NOTICE OF CONTINUED HEARING

9/12/2019: Notice (name extension) - Notice NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER AND NOTICE OF CONTINUED HEARING

Proof of Service by Mail - Proof of Service by Mail

9/12/2019: Proof of Service by Mail - Proof of Service by Mail

Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information - Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

7/24/2019: Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information - Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

Proof of Service by Mail - Proof of Service by Mail

7/24/2019: Proof of Service by Mail - Proof of Service by Mail

Proof of Service by Mail - Proof of Service by Mail

8/16/2019: Proof of Service by Mail - Proof of Service by Mail

Declaration (name extension) - Declaration DECLARATION OF BRYAN P. REDINGTON RE: NOTICE OF INTENT TO DEPOSIT FUNDS

8/16/2019: Declaration (name extension) - Declaration DECLARATION OF BRYAN P. REDINGTON RE: NOTICE OF INTENT TO DEPOSIT FUNDS

Notice (name extension) - Notice NOTICE OF CONTINUED HEARING ON UNRESOLVED CLAIMS

8/16/2019: Notice (name extension) - Notice NOTICE OF CONTINUED HEARING ON UNRESOLVED CLAIMS

Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Petition Petition and Declaration Regarding Unreso...)

7/10/2019: Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Petition Petition and Declaration Regarding Unreso...)

First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

3/6/2019: First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

3/6/2019: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Petition and Declaration Regarding Unresolved Claims and Deposit of Undistributed Surplus Proceeds - Petition and Declaration Regarding Unresolved Claims and Deposit of Undistributed Surplus Proceeds

3/6/2019: Petition and Declaration Regarding Unresolved Claims and Deposit of Undistributed Surplus Proceeds - Petition and Declaration Regarding Unresolved Claims and Deposit of Undistributed Surplus Proceeds

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

3/6/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Hearing on Petition - Notice of Hearing on Petition

3/6/2019: Notice of Hearing on Petition - Notice of Hearing on Petition

Proof of Service by Mail - Proof of Service by Mail

3/15/2019: Proof of Service by Mail - Proof of Service by Mail

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/05/2020
  • Hearing02/05/2020 at 10:30 AM in Department 94 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Hearing - Other (name extension)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2019
  • DocketHearing - Other Disbursement of Funds scheduled for 02/05/2020 at 10:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2019
  • DocketNotice NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER AND NOTICE OF CONTINUED HEARING; Filed by: Mortgage Lender Services, Inc. (Petitioner); As to: Grace R. Rubilotta (Respondent)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2019
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail; Filed by: Mortgage Lender Services, Inc. (Petitioner); As to: Grace R. Rubilotta (Respondent)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2019
  • DocketMinute Order (Hearing on Petition Petition and Declaration Regarding Unreso...)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2019
  • DocketHearing on Petition Petition and Declaration Regarding Unresolved Claims and Deposit of Undistributed Surplus Proceeds of Trustee's Sale scheduled for 09/11/2019 at 10:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94 updated: Result Date to 09/11/2019; Result Type to Held - Motion Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2019
  • DocketNotice NOTICE OF CONTINUED HEARING ON UNRESOLVED CLAIMS; Filed by: Mortgage Lender Services, Inc. (Petitioner); As to: Grace R. Rubilotta (Respondent)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2019
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail; Filed by: Mortgage Lender Services, Inc. (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2019
  • DocketDeclaration DECLARATION OF BRYAN P. REDINGTON RE: NOTICE OF INTENT TO DEPOSIT FUNDS; Filed by: Mortgage Lender Services, Inc. (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2019
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail; Filed by: Mortgage Lender Services, Inc. (Petitioner); As to: Grace R. Rubilotta (Respondent)

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 07/10/2019
  • DocketOn the Court's own motion, Hearing on Petition Petition and Declaration Regarding Unresolved Claims and Deposit of Undistributed Surplus Proceeds of Trustee's Sale scheduled for 07/10/2019 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94 Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion was rescheduled to 09/11/2019 09:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2019
  • DocketHearing on Petition Petition and Declaration Regarding Unresolved Claims and Deposit of Undistributed Surplus Proceeds of Trustee's Sale scheduled for 09/11/2019 at 09:00 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2019
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail; Filed by: Mortgage Lender Services, Inc. (Petitioner); As to: Grace R. Rubilotta (Respondent)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2019
  • DocketHearing on Petition Petition and Declaration Regarding Unresolved Claims and Deposit of Undistributed Surplus Proceeds of Trustee's Sale scheduled for 07/10/2019 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2019
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Wendy Chang in Department 94 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2019
  • DocketPetition and Declaration Regarding Unresolved Claims and Deposit of Undistributed Surplus Proceeds of Trustee's Sale; Filed by: Mortgage Lender Services, Inc. (Petitioner); As to: Grace R. Rubilotta (Respondent)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Mortgage Lender Services, Inc. (Petitioner); As to: Grace R. Rubilotta (Respondent)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2019
  • DocketNotice of Hearing on Petition; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2019
  • DocketFirst Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: 19STCP00712    Hearing Date: February 05, 2020    Dept: 26

In re 752 Armstead Street

HEARING ON DISBURSEMENT OF SURPLUS FUNDS

(Civ. Code §§ 2924(c)-(d))

TENTATIVE RULING:

Hearing on Disbursement of Funds is PLACED OFF CALENDAR.

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY UNCLAIMED SURPLUS FUNDS SHOULD NOT ESCHEAT TO THE STATE SET FOR FEBRUARY 8, 2023 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 26 IN THE SPRING STREET COURTHOUSE.

ANALYSIS:

On March 6, 2019, Petitioner Mortgage Lender Services, Inc. (“Petitioner”) filed this Petition and Declaration Regarding Unresolved Claims and Deposit of Undistributed Surplus Proceeds of Trustee’s Sale (the “Petition”). The Petition was granted on September 11, 2019 at which time the Court ordered Petitioner to deposit surplus funds of $8,943.10 and give notice of the hearing on disbursement of funds set for February 5, 2020. (Minute Order, 9/11/19.) Petitioner gave notice as ordered on September 12,20 19 and deposited the funds on September 19, 2019. Following completion of those tasks, Petitioner was discharged from liability with respect to the undistributed surplus funds.

Pursuant to Civil Code section 2924j, subdivision (d), “the court shall consider all claims filed at least 15 days before the date on which the hearing is scheduled by the court.” (Civ. Code, § 2924j, subd. (d).) No claims have been filed to date. Therefore, the hearing on disbursement of funds is PLACED OFF CALENDAR. PURSUANT TO CAL. GOVERNMENT CODE SECTION 68084.1, AN ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY UNCLAIMED SURPLUS FUNDS SHOULD NOT ESCHEAT TO THE STATE IS SET FOR FEBRUARY 8, 2023 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 26 IN THE SPRING STREET COURTHOUSE.

Court clerk to give notice.