This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/03/2016 at 18:10:50 (UTC).

MORENO, GUILLERMO VS POTRERO

Case Summary

On 11/03/2014 MORENO, GUILLERMO filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against POTRERO. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Downey Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MICHAEL J. PEARCE. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****9115

  • Filing Date:

    11/03/2014

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MICHAEL J. PEARCE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MORENO GUILLERMO

Defendant

POTRERO INC DBA POTRERO CLUB AND RESTAURANT

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

08/28/2015

ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF FULL SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT FILED.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/24/2015

REJECT SHEET SENT TO (MORENO, GUILLERMO) C/O GARY BERKOVICH FOR REJECTION OF SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT OUR RECORDS INDICATE THERE IS AN ATTORNEY ON FILE FOR THE ABOVE CASE. ALL DOCUMENTS MUST BE SUBMITTED BY THE ATTORNEY. ALSO, THERE IS OUTSTANDING FEES FROM THE FEE WAIVER SUBMITTED ON 08/07/15

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/07/2015

RECEIVED FEES FROM (MORENO, GUILLERMO) C/O GARY BERKOVICH IN THE SUM OF $ 1.50 FOR SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT VIA FAXED . RECEIPT # DOW402835016

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/01/2015

EXHIBITS ORDERED DESTROYED PER SECTION 1952{D} CCP.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/23/2015

RECEIVED FEES FROM (POTRERO) INC DBA (POTRERO CLUB AND RESTAURANT) IN THE SUM OF $ 8.25 FOR ABANDONMENT OF APPEAL VIA FAXED . RECEIPT # DOW506799015

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/23/2015

ABANDONMENT OF APPEAL FILED .

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/17/2015

SUBPOENA AND PROOF OF SERVICE FILED. SERVED AS NAMED AS TO LILY LYN .

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/17/2015

SUBPOENA AND PROOF OF SERVICE FILED. SERVED AS NAMED AS TO ROBERT TSAY .

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/17/2015

SUBPOENA AND PROOF OF SERVICE FILED. SERVED AS NAMED AS TO JOSE ARANDA (POTRERO NIGHT CLUB) .

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/17/2015

SUBPOENA AND PROOF OF SERVICE FILED. SERVED AS NAMED AS TO ESTHER (ESTER) VALADEZ (PORTRERO NIGHT CLUB) .

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
18 More Docket Entries
01/22/2015

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED AND MAILED TO ALL PARTIES, AND JUDGMENT DEBTOR'S STATEMENT OF ASSETS MAILED TO (POTRERO) INC DBA (POTRERO CLUB AND RESTAURANT) .

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/22/2015

CASE FILE RETURNED TO SMALL CLAIMS OFFICE FROM COURTROOM .

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/22/2015

EXHIBIT(S) OF (MORENO, GUILLERMO) STORED IN VAULT SET FOR DESTRUCTION ON 04/22/15 AT 05:00P M, IN DEPT. CLK .

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/21/2015

CAUSE CALLED AT 08:30A M, IN DEPT. SE2 , HON. MICHAEL J. PEARCE PRESIDING FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING. PLAINTIFF APPEARING . DEFENDANT APPEARING BY EDWARD HOLLANDER .

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/21/2015

AUTHORIZATION TO APPEAR ON BEHALF OF PARTY FILED AS TO (POTRERO) INC DBA (POTRERO CLUB AND RESTAURANT) .

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/21/2015

COURT TAKES MATTER UNDER SUBMISSION.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/17/2014

PROOF OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM FILED. SERVED AS TO (POTRERO) INC DBA (POTRERO CLUB AND RESTAURANT) BY SUB-SERVING MARGITO TINTI . COSTS OF $ 58.50 .

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/04/2014

ORDER GRANTING REQUEST TO WAIVE COURT FEES SIGNED AND FILED AS TO (MORENO, GUILLERMO) .

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/03/2014

PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO DEFENDANT FILED. RN FEE WAIVER. HEARING SET FOR 01/21/15 AT 08:30 AM IN DPT. SE2.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/03/2014

REQUEST TO WAIVE COURT FEES FILED BY (MORENO, GUILLERMO) .

[+] Read More [-] Read Less