This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/08/2019 at 14:45:18 (UTC).

MOORPARK REAL INVESTMENTS LLC VS AXXELL COMMUNICATIONS INC.

Case Summary

On 06/01/2012 MOORPARK REAL INVESTMENTS LLC filed a Property - Commercial Eviction lawsuit against AXXELL COMMUNICATIONS INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, San Pedro Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0504

  • Filing Date:

    06/01/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Commercial Eviction

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Pedro Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

MOORPARK REAL INVESTMENTS LLC

YASHAR FAMILY TRUST

YASHAR DAVID

Defendants

AXXELL COMMUNICATIONS INC.

AXXELL COMMUNICATIONS INC. DBA SKYCOM WIRELESS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

ROBISON, WILLIAM C. ESQ.

ROBISON WILLIAM C. ESQ.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/25/2012
  • RETURN ON ATTACHMENT/EXECUTION FILED BY THE SHERIFF'S. ORIGINAL WRIT RETURN ON ATTACHMENT/EXECUTION FILED BY THE SHERIFF'S. ORIGINAL WRIT NOT ATTACHED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2012
  • DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY CLERK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2012
  • CLERK'S NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED AND MAILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2012
  • APPLICATION FOR ISSUANCE OF WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED APPLICATION FOR ISSUANCE OF WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2012
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION OF REAL PROPERTY ISSUED TO LA COUNTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2012
  • SUBMISSION FOR DEFAULT AND JUDGMENT PENDING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2012
  • PROOF OF SERVICE FOR ALL OTHER OCCUPANTS FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2012
  • DEFAULT ENTERED AS TO ALL UNNAMED OCCUPANTS PURSUANT TO CCP 415.46 DEFAULT ENTERED AS TO ALL UNNAMED OCCUPANTS PURSUANT TO CCP 415.46

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2012
  • SUBMISSION FOR DEFAULT AND JUDGMENT PENDING *** DEFAULT PROCESSE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2012
  • PROOF OF SERVICE TO COMPLAINT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2012
  • FAULTY PROOF OF SERVICE FILED FOR ALL OTHER OCCUPANTS. ADDRESS WHERE FAULTY PROOF OF SERVICE FILED FOR ALL OTHER OCCUPANTS. ADDRESS WHERE PARTY WAS SERVED DOES NOT MATCH PREMISE ADDRESS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2012
  • REQUEST FOR DEFAULT FILED AND ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2012
  • NOTICE OF REJECTION- REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT AS TO ALL OTHER NOTICE OF REJECTION- REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT AS TO ALL OTHER OCCUPANTS. ADDRESS WHERE PARTY WAS SERVED DOES NOT MATCH PREMISE ADDRESS ON FILE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2012
  • NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER MAILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2012
  • COMPLAINT FILED Filing Fee: 240.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2012
  • SUMMONS FILED

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.