This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/09/2019 at 12:48:58 (UTC).

MOORE, JESSICA VS REGALADO, MANNY

Case Summary

On 06/05/2014 MOORE, JESSICA filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against REGALADO, MANNY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Van Nuys Courthouse East located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is RICHARD F. WALMARK. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****4392

  • Filing Date:

    06/05/2014

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Van Nuys Courthouse East

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

RICHARD F. WALMARK

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MOORE JESSICA

Defendant

REGALADO MANNY

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/19/2014
  • DocketFUNDS IN THE AMOUNT OF $ 35.00 REFUNDED TO SHERIFF'S DEPT , RE: SERVICE FEES/ REFUND ORDER R06956 . CASE FILE RETURNED TO SMALL CLAIMS DEPARTMENT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2014
  • DocketFUNDS IN THE AMOUNT OF $ 426.71 REFUNDED TO JESSICA MOORE , RE: PAYMENT TO COURT/NTB REFUND ORDER R06208 . CASE FILE RETURNED TO SMALL CLAIMS DEPARTMENT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2014
  • DocketFUNDS IN THE AMOUNT OF $ 426.71 REFUNDED TO JESSICA MOORE , RE: PAYMENT TO COURT/ REFUND ORDER R06208 . CASE FILE RETURNED TO SMALL CLAIMS DEPARTMENT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2014
  • DocketCASE FILE FORWARDED TO BOOKKEEPER'S OFFICE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2014
  • DocketJUDGMENT CREDITORS REQUEST FOR FUNDS RECEIVED AS TO (MOORE, JESSICA) .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2014
  • DocketJUDGMENT CREDITOR'S REQUEST TO RECEIVE FUNDS BY MAIL FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2014
  • DocketCLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED JUDGMENT CREDITOR'S REQUEST FOR FUNDS DUE BACK 07-30-14 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2014
  • DocketREQUEST TO PAY JUDGMENT TO COURT FILED AND THE TOTAL SUM OF $ 511.71 PAID. FULL SATISFACTION JUDGMENT ENTERED AS TO JUDGMENT DEBTOR (REGALADO, MANNY) ON 07/10/14 . RECEIPT # LAV485216013 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2014
  • DocketACKNOWLEDGMENT OF FULL SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT ENTERED PURSUANT TO SECTION 116.850 CCP OR 116.860 OR 724.020 CCP. PAYMENT TO COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2014
  • DocketNOTICE OF PAYMENT DUE ON WAIVED FEES AND COSTS FILED AND MAILED TO (REGALADO, MANNY) PURSUANT TO SECTION 68637 G.C. FOR THE TOTAL AMOUNT OF $ 65.00 . CERTIFICATE OF MAILING COMPLETED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2014
  • DocketNOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED AND MAILED TO ALL PARTIES, AND JUDGMENT DEBTOR'S STATEMENT OF ASSETS MAILED TO (REGALADO, MANNY) .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2014
  • DocketCASE FILE RETURNED TO SMALL CLAIMS OFFICE FROM COURTROOM NWP .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2014
  • DocketCAUSE CALLED AT 09:30A M, IN DEPT. NWP , HON. RICHARD F. WALMARK PRESIDING FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING. PLAINTIFF APPEARING . DEFENDANT APPEARING .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2014
  • DocketCOURT ORDERS JUDGMENT ENTERED AS FOLLOWS :

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2014
  • DocketJUDGMENT ENTERED AS A FINAL DISPOSITION ON 07/01/14 . FOR (MOORE, JESSICA) . AGAINST (REGALADO, MANNY) . PRINCIPAL $ 425.50 . COSTS $ 65.00 . TOTAL $ 490.50 . EXECUTION STAYED 30 DAYS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2014
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM FILED. SERVED AS TO (REGALADO, MANNY) . COSTS OF $ 35.00 . FEE WAIVER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2014
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO DEFENDANT FILED. RN FEE WAIVER. HEARING SET FOR 07/01/14 AT 08:30 AM IN DPT. NWP.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2014
  • DocketREQUEST TO WAIVE COURT FEES FILED BY (MOORE, JESSICA) .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2014
  • DocketORDER GRANTING REQUEST TO WAIVE COURT FEES SIGNED AND FILED AS TO (MOORE, JESSICA) .

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.