This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/02/2019 at 07:44:06 (UTC).

MONTEREY STATION , LLC VS WILFREDO BUCARDO, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 12/05/2017 MONTEREY STATION , LLC filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against WILFREDO BUCARDO. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, West Covina Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is SUSAN J. TOWNSEND. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0657

  • Filing Date:

    12/05/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    West Covina Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

SUSAN J. TOWNSEND

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MONTEREY STATION LLC

Defendants

BUCARDO WILFREDO

Pomona, CA 91767

ALFARO CATHERINE

Pomona, CA 91767

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

EVANS CHRIS JAMES

 

Court Documents

Writ - Return

2/21/2018: Writ - Return

RETURNED MAIL - Notice of Unlawful Detainer

3/26/2018: RETURNED MAIL - Notice of Unlawful Detainer

Proof of Personal Service

12/22/2017: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

12/22/2017: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

12/22/2017: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

12/22/2017: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Judgment - Unlawful Detainer

12/28/2017: Judgment - Unlawful Detainer

Application for Writ of Possession

12/28/2017: Application for Writ of Possession

Writ of (name extension) - Possession (forward to sheriff's)

12/28/2017: Writ of (name extension) - Possession (forward to sheriff's)

Civil Case Cover Sheet

12/5/2017: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - on Complaint

12/5/2017: Summons - on Complaint

Complaint

12/5/2017: Complaint

Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - (ALL OCCUPANTS)

12/6/2017: Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - (ALL OCCUPANTS)

Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - (Wilfredo Bucardo)

12/6/2017: Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - (Wilfredo Bucardo)

Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - (Catherine Alfaro)

12/6/2017: Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - (Catherine Alfaro)

Property Owner/Landlord Only Hearing Notice

12/5/2017: Property Owner/Landlord Only Hearing Notice

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

12/5/2017: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/17/2019
  • The case is placed in special status of: Case Destroyed pursuant to California Government Code Section 68151 and 68153.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2018
  • RETURNED MAIL Notice of Unlawful Detainer; Filed by: Clerk; As to: Catherine Alfaro (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2018
  • RETURNED MAIL Notice of Unlawful Detainer; Filed by: Clerk; As to: Wilfredo Bucardo (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2018
  • Writ - Return ( Wholly Satisfied);; Costs Credits: 0.00; Interest Credits: 0.00; Principal Credits: 0.00; Possession: Yes; Judgment Satisfaction Type: Wholly Satisfied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2017
  • Application for Writ of Possession; Filed by: Monterey Station , LLC (Plaintiff); Daily Rental Value: 52.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2017
  • Writ of Possession (forward to sheriff's); Filed by: Monterey Station , LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2017
  • Judgment - Unlawful Detainer; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2017
  • Order to Show Cause - Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 02/14/2018 at 08:30 AM in West Covina Courthouse at Civil Clerk's Office Not Held - Vacated by Court on 12/28/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2017
  • Default judgment entered for Plaintiff Monterey Station , LLC against Defendant Wilfredo Bucardo and Defendant Catherine Alfaro on the Complaint filed by Monterey Station , LLC on 12/05/2017 for a total of $0.00.; Judgment for possession is granted against all unnamed occupants pursuant to Code of Civil Procedure section 415.46.; Restitution and possession of the premises located at 180 E. Monterey Ave. #337, Pomona, CA 91767 is granted for plaintiff(s);; The Rental Agreement under which the property is held is hereby cancelled.; Lease Agreement under which the property is held is hereby forfeited.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2017
  • Proof of Personal Service; Filed by: Monterey Station , LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Catherine Alfaro (Defendant); Service Date: 12/07/2017; Service Cost: 45.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 12/22/2017
  • Default entered as to Wilfredo Bucardo; Catherine Alfaro; unnamed occupants pursuant to CCP 415.46; On the Complaint filed by Monterey Station , LLC on 12/05/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2017
  • Proof of Personal Service; Filed by: Monterey Station , LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Wilfredo Bucardo (Defendant); Service Date: 12/07/2017; Service Cost: 45.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2017
  • Notice of Unlawful Detainer mailed 12/06/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2017
  • Complaint; Filed by: Monterey Station , LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Wilfredo Bucardo (Defendant); Catherine Alfaro (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2017
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Monterey Station , LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2017
  • Summons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2017
  • Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2017
  • Property Owner/Landlord Only Hearing Notice; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2017
  • Case assigned to Hon. Susan J. Townsend in Department 6 West Covina Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2017
  • Order to Show Cause - Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 02/14/2018 at 08:30 AM in West Covina Courthouse at Civil Clerk's Office

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer EVANS CHRIS