This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/16/2019 at 18:05:44 (UTC).

MONTEREY HOLDINGS CO. INC. VS SKY ISLAND INC., ET AL.

Case Summary

On 02/26/2018 MONTEREY HOLDINGS CO INC filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against SKY ISLAND INC . This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is JON R. TAKASUGI. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3248

  • Filing Date:

    02/26/2018

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

JON R. TAKASUGI

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Cross Defendant

MONTEREY HOLDINGS CO. INC.

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

SKY ISLAND INC.

RAMIREZ EDRAS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

TRAN JOHN DAVID

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorney

MIKHAYLOVA OLESYA

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal

8/8/2018: Request for Dismissal

Cross-Complaint

4/4/2018: Cross-Complaint

Answer

4/4/2018: Answer

Summons - on Cross Complaint

4/4/2018: Summons - on Cross Complaint

Proof of Service by Mail

3/15/2018: Proof of Service by Mail

Declaration (name extension) - of Diligence

3/15/2018: Declaration (name extension) - of Diligence

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

3/15/2018: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

3/7/2018: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Service by Mail

3/7/2018: Proof of Service by Mail

Summons - on Complaint

2/26/2018: Summons - on Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

2/26/2018: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

2/26/2018: Complaint

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

5/3/2018: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

5/17/2018: Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

15 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/08/2018
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by: Sky Island Inc. (Cross-Complainant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2018
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 08/26/2019 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 08/08/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2018
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 03/01/2021 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 08/08/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2018
  • DocketRequest for dismissal With Prejudice entered as to entire action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2018
  • DocketNotice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2018
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by: Monterey Holdings Co. Inc. (Plaintiff); As to: Edras Ramirez (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2018
  • Docket; Default not entered as to Edras Ramirez; On the Complaint filed by Monterey Holdings Co. Inc. on 02/26/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2018
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: Sky Island Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2018
  • DocketCross-Complaint; Filed by: Sky Island Inc. (Cross-Complainant); As to: Monterey Holdings Co. Inc. (Cross-Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2018
  • DocketSummons on Cross Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 03/15/2018
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail; Filed by: Monterey Holdings Co. Inc. (Plaintiff); As to: Edras Ramirez (Defendant); After Substituted Service of Summons & Complaint ?: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2018
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Monterey Holdings Co. Inc. (Plaintiff); As to: Sky Island Inc. (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 02/28/18; Service Cost: 0.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2018
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail; Filed by: Monterey Holdings Co. Inc. (Plaintiff); As to: Sky Island Inc. (Defendant); After Substituted Service of Summons & Complaint ?: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Monterey Holdings Co. Inc. (Plaintiff); As to: Sky Island Inc. (Defendant); Edras Ramirez (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2018
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Monterey Holdings Co. Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2018
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2018
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2018
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Jon R. Takasugi in Department 77 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2018
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 08/26/2019 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 77

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2018
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 03/01/2021 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 77

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SKY ISLAND INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MIKHAYLOVA OLESYA