Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/08/2019 at 01:30:57 (UTC).

MONROVIA-MYRTLE VS YANG, MAX

Case Summary

On 04/13/2016 MONROVIA-MYRTLE filed a Property - Commercial Eviction lawsuit against YANG, MAX. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Pasadena Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is WILLIAM D. DODSON. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****1639

  • Filing Date:

    04/13/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Commercial Eviction

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Pasadena Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

WILLIAM D. DODSON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MONROVIA-MYRTLE LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Defendants

YANG MAX AN INDIVIDUAL

TRINITY FORCE INTERNATIONAL A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

YANG MAX

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

WOLF, RIFKIN & SHAPIRO - MARK J. ROSENBAUM

Attorney at WOLF, RIFKIN & SHAPIRO

ROSENBAUM MARK J.

Defendant Attorneys

LAW OFFICES OF VINCENT W. DAVIS & ASSOC. - AIHUI SU ESQ

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF VINCENT W. DAVIS & ASSOC.

SU AIHUI ESQ

 

Court Documents

Default Judgment - Default Judgment

8/1/2016: Default Judgment - Default Judgment

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/24/2018
  • Case reassigned to Pasadena Courthouse in Department R - Hon. William D. Dodsoneffective 12/24/2018; Reason: Inventory Transfer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/24/2018
  • Case reassigned to Pasadena Courthouse in Department R - Hon. William D. Dodsoneffective 12/24/2018; Reason: Inventory Transfer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2017
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED FROM LOS ANGELES COUNTY UNSATISFIED WITH COSTS OF $ 120.00 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2016
  • ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT ISSUED. A/S . RECEIPT # PAS512985005 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2016
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED BY ATTORNEY FOR (MONROVIA-MYRTLE) LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2016
  • CLERK'S NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT & NOTICE RE: EXHIBITS/ DEPOSITION ISSUED. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FILED AS TO THE AMENDED JUDGMENT .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2016
  • MINUTE ORDER - CAUSE CALLED AT 01:30P M, IN DEPT. NEA , HON. WILLIAM D. DODSON, COMMISSIONER PRESIDING FOR HEARING RE: MOTION TO AMEND JUDGMENT . MOTION IS GRANTED. JUDGMENT IS AMENDED TO INCLUDE COSTS OF $1485.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2016
  • MINUTE ORDER - CAUSE CALLED AT 01:30P M, IN DEPT. NEA , HON. WILLIAM D. DODSON, COMMISSIONER PRESIDING FOR HEARING RE: MOTION TO AMEND JUDGMENT . MOTION IS GRANTED. JUDGMENT IS AMENDED TO INCLUDE COSTS OF $1485.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2016
  • NOTICE OF MOTION TO AMEND JUDGMENT , DECLARATION, AND POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT THEREOF FILED. RECEIPT # PAS623737019 . MATTER SET FOR HEARING ON 11/29/16 AT 01:30P M, IN DEPT. NEA .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2016
  • ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT ISSUED. A/S . RECEIPT # PAS526985023 .

    Read MoreRead Less
29 More Docket Entries
  • 05/16/2016
  • PROOF OF SERVICE RE: SUMMONS,COMPLAINT,CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET,ADDENDUM AND STATEMENT OF LOCATION FILED. SERVED AS TO (TRINITY FORCE INTERNATIONAL) A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION . COSTS OF $ 100.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2016
  • ANSWER FILED OF (YANG, MAX) AN INDIVIDUAL . RECEIPT # PAS511208027 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2016
  • DEFENDANT TRINITY FORCE INTERNATIONAL'S NOTICE OF ERRATA RE DEFENDANT'S ANSWER FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2016
  • APPLICATION/DECLARATION AND ORDER ALLOWING SERVICE BY POSTING AND MAILING FOR (YANG, MAX) AN INDIVIDUAL RECEIVED AND FORWARDED TO DEPT. NEA FOR CONSIDERATION. RECEIPT # PAS443036011

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2016
  • ANSWER FILED OF (TRINITY FORCE INTERNATIONAL) A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION . RECEIPT # PAS520022008 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2016
  • NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILING MAILED TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/COUNSEL. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2016
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED. RN 027. Filing Fee: 385.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2016
  • SUMMONS ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2016
  • SUMMONS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2016
  • MATTER SET FOR UNLAWFUL DETAINER ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING ON 09/22/16 AT 08:30A M, IN DEPARTMENT NEA . .

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MONROVIA-MYRTLE LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SU AIHUI