Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/06/2020 at 23:18:07 (UTC).

MONROVIA ESTATES, L.P. VS MARY STEVENS, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 12/03/2019 MONROVIA ESTATES, L P filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against MARY STEVENS. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Pasadena Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is WILLIAM D. DODSON. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3685

  • Filing Date:

    12/03/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Pasadena Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

WILLIAM D. DODSON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MONROVIA ESTATES L.P.

Claimant

ELLERBRACKE ELIZABETH

Defendants

STEVENS MARY

COLLINS JAMES

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

RUBIN JULIE H

 

Court Documents

Stipulation for the Appointment of Court Commissioner as Temporary Judge - Stipulation for the Appointment of Court Commissioner as Temporary Judge

3/3/2020: Stipulation for the Appointment of Court Commissioner as Temporary Judge - Stipulation for the Appointment of Court Commissioner as Temporary Judge

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Hearing on Claim of Right to Possession (Arrieta)) of 03/03/2020

3/3/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Hearing on Claim of Right to Possession (Arrieta)) of 03/03/2020

Claim of Right to Possession and Notice of Hearing - Claim of Right to Possession and Notice of Hearing

2/27/2020: Claim of Right to Possession and Notice of Hearing - Claim of Right to Possession and Notice of Hearing

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Claim of Right to Possession and Notice of Hearing]

2/27/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Claim of Right to Possession and Notice of Hearing]

Other - (name extension) - Other - COPY OF CLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSSESSION AND NOTICE OF HEARING AS TO ELIZABETH ELLERBRACKE, RECEIVED STAMPED 02/25/2020 BY L MONTE SHERIFFS

2/27/2020: Other - (name extension) - Other - COPY OF CLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSSESSION AND NOTICE OF HEARING AS TO ELIZABETH ELLERBRACKE, RECEIVED STAMPED 02/25/2020 BY L MONTE SHERIFFS

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

12/3/2019: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

12/3/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - Summons on Complaint

12/4/2019: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) (ALL OCCUPANTS)

12/5/2019: Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) (ALL OCCUPANTS)

Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) (James Collins)

12/5/2019: Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) (James Collins)

Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) (Mary Stevens)

12/5/2019: Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) (Mary Stevens)

Application for Order to Post - Application for Order to Post

12/23/2019: Application for Order to Post - Application for Order to Post

Proof of Service by Posting - Proof of Service by Posting

1/21/2020: Proof of Service by Posting - Proof of Service by Posting

Proof of Service by Posting - Proof of Service by Posting

1/21/2020: Proof of Service by Posting - Proof of Service by Posting

Default Judgment - Unlawful Detainer - Default Judgment - Unlawful Detainer

1/24/2020: Default Judgment - Unlawful Detainer - Default Judgment - Unlawful Detainer

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

1/24/2020: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Application for Issuance of Writ of Execution, Possession or Sale - Application for Issuance of Writ of Execution, Possession or Sale

1/31/2020: Application for Issuance of Writ of Execution, Possession or Sale - Application for Issuance of Writ of Execution, Possession or Sale

Writ of Execution - Writ of Execution

2/3/2020: Writ of Execution - Writ of Execution

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/03/2020
  • DocketUpdated -- Claim of Right to Possession and Notice of Hearing: Filed By: ELIZABETH ELLERBRACKE (Arrieta Claimant); Result: Denied; Result Date: 03/03/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2020
  • DocketStipulation for the Appointment of Court Commissioner as Temporary Judge; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2020
  • DocketMinute Order (Hearing on Claim of Right to Possession (Arrieta))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Hearing on Claim of Right to Possession (Arrieta)) of 03/03/2020; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2020
  • DocketHearing on Claim of Right to Possession (Arrieta) scheduled for 03/03/2020 at 08:30 AM in Pasadena Courthouse at Department R updated: Result Date to 03/03/2020; Result Type to Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2020
  • DocketClaim of Right to Possession and Notice of Hearing; Filed by: ELIZABETH ELLERBRACKE (Arrieta Claimant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2020
  • DocketRequest to Waive Court Fees; Filed by: ELIZABETH ELLERBRACKE (Arrieta Claimant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2020
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Signed and Filed by: Clerk; As to: ELIZABETH ELLERBRACKE (Arrieta Claimant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2020
  • DocketHearing on Claim of Right to Possession (Arrieta) scheduled for 03/03/2020 at 08:30 AM in Pasadena Courthouse at Department R

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2020
  • DocketOther - COPY OF CLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSSESSION AND NOTICE OF HEARING AS TO ELIZABETH ELLERBRACKE, RECEIVED STAMPED 02/25/2020 BY L MONTE SHERIFFS; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 01/21/2020
  • DocketProof of Service by Posting; Filed by: Monrovia Estates, L.P. (Plaintiff); As to: James Collins (Defendant); Mailing Date: 12/27/2019; Service Cost: 87.90; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • DocketApplication for Order to Post; Filed by: Monrovia Estates, L.P. (Plaintiff); As to: Mary Stevens (Defendant); James Collins (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • DocketNotice of Unlawful Detainer mailed 12/05/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 02/11/2020 at 08:30 AM in Pasadena Courthouse at Civil Clerk's Office

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Monrovia Estates, L.P. (Plaintiff); As to: Mary Stevens (Defendant); James Collins (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. William D. Dodson in Department R Pasadena Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Monrovia Estates, L.P. (Plaintiff); As to: Mary Stevens (Defendant); James Collins (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Monrovia Estates, L.P. (Plaintiff); As to: Mary Stevens (Defendant); James Collins (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2019
  • DocketProperty Owner/Landlord Only Hearing Notice; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Julie H. Rubin