This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/28/2021 at 18:36:38 (UTC).

MONIKA WOOD VS HUNTER WARFIELD, INC., ET AL.

Case Summary

On 08/17/2020 MONIKA WOOD filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against HUNTER WARFIELD, INC . This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Van Nuys Courthouse East located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is RICHARD F. WALMARK. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2299

  • Filing Date:

    08/17/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

RICHARD F. WALMARK

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WOOD MONIKA

Defendants

HUNTER WARFIELD INC.

BROOKFIELD PROPERTIES MANAGEMENT LLC

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

10/27/2020: Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

8/17/2020: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court, Notice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol]

8/19/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court, Notice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol]

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/29/2020
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 01/28/2021 at 08:30 AM in Van Nuys Courthouse East at Department P Not Held - Vacated by Court on 10/29/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by: Monika Wood (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • DocketOn the Plaintiff's Claim filed by Monika Wood on 08/17/2020, entered Request for Dismissal with prejudice filed by Monika Wood as to the entire action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • DocketNotice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol; Issued by: Clerk; As to: Monika Wood (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for [Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court, Notice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol]; Issued and Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2020
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 01/28/2021 at 08:30 AM in Van Nuys Courthouse East at Department P

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2020
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Monika Wood (Plaintiff); As to: Hunter Warfield, Inc. (Defendant); Brookfield Properties Management LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Richard F. Walmark in Department P Van Nuys Courthouse East

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Hunter Warfield, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where BROOKFIELD PROPERTIES MANAGMENT CA INC. A DELAWARE CORPORATION is a litigant