Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/29/2017 at 09:05:38 (UTC).

MODERN FINANCE CO INC VS MACEDONIO PEREZ HERNANDEZ, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 07/12/2017 MODERN FINANCE CO INC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against MACEDONIO PEREZ HERNANDEZ. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Van Nuys Courthouse East located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is FIRDAUS F. DORDI. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6249

  • Filing Date:

    07/12/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Van Nuys Courthouse East

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

FIRDAUS F. DORDI

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MODERN FINANCE CO INC

Defendants

CORTEZ ROLON XOCHITL M

HERNANDEZ MACEDONIO PEREZ

 

Court Documents

Unknown

9/19/2017: Unknown

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

7/12/2017: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/19/2017
  • Request for Dismissal; Filed by: Modern Finance Co Inc (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2017
  • Request for dismissal Without Prejudice entered as to entire action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 09/19/2017 at 08:30 AM in at Department Z Not Held - Vacated by Court on 09/19/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2017
  • Proof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Modern Finance Co Inc (Plaintiff); As to: MACEDONIO PEREZ HERNANDEZ (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 07/15/17; Service Cost: 80.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2017
  • Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims); Filed by: Modern Finance Co Inc (Plaintiff); As to: XOCHITL M CORTEZ ROLON (Defendant); Service Cost: 30.00; Service Cost Waived: No; Service Date: 07/15/17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2017
  • Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Modern Finance Co Inc (Plaintiff); As to: MACEDONIO PEREZ HERNANDEZ (Defendant); XOCHITL M CORTEZ ROLON (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2017
  • Invoice: Small Claims > 12 per year-Filing by person >12/year- CCP 116.230(c); Fee: $100.00; Payment: 100.00 Receipt: VE-2017-0015248 (Check); Balance: $0.00;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2017
  • Case assigned to Hon. Firdaus F. Dordi at Van Nuys Courthouse East in Department Z

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 09/19/2017 at 08:30 AM in Van Nuys Courthouse East at Department Z

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MODERN FINANCE COMPANY INC. is a litigant