Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/05/2019 at 00:14:41 (UTC).

MODERN FINANCE CO. INC. VS ARELLANO, MISAEL

Case Summary

On 08/17/2015 MODERN FINANCE CO INC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against ARELLANO, MISAEL. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Van Nuys Courthouse East located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is RAY SANTANA. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****7113

  • Filing Date:

    08/17/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Van Nuys Courthouse East

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

RAY SANTANA

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MODERN FINANCE CO. INC.

Defendant

ARELLANO MISAEL

 

Court Documents

Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment

10/27/2016: Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/28/2016
  • Updated -- Judgment entered on 10/28/2016 ; Status Date changed from 10/14/2015 to 10/28/2016 ; Status changed from Entered to Satisfied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2016
  • Updated -- Judgment entered on 10/28/2016 ; Status Date changed from 10/28/2016 to 10/28/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2016
  • Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment; Filed by: (MODERN FINANCE CO. INC.) (Plaintiff); As to: MISAEL ARELLANO (Defendant); Type: Full Satisfaction

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2016
  • Writ - Return Wholly Satisfied; Filed by: Costs Credits: 49.14; Interest Credits: 94.08; Principal Credits: 2,580.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2016
  • Updated -- Writ of Execution: Result: Returned and Filed; Result Date: 10/07/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2015
  • WRIT OF EXECUTION ISSUED TO LOS ANGELES COUNTY. SASE . RECEIPT # LAV..... .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2015
  • DECLARATION RE: ACCRUED INTEREST FILED, $ 24.14 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2015
  • CASE FILE RETURNED TO SMALL CLAIMS OFFICE FROM COURTROOM .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2015
  • AUTHORIZATION TO APPEAR ON BEHALF OF PARTY FILED AS TO (MODERN FINANCE CO. INC.) .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2015
  • CAUSE CALLED AT 08:30A M, IN DEPT. NWZ , HON. RAY SANTANA PRESIDING FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING. PLAINTIFF APPEARING . NO APPEARANCE BY OR FOR DEFENDANT .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2015
  • COURT ORDERS JUDGMENT ENTERED AS FOLLOWS :

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2015
  • JUDGMENT ENTERED AS A FINAL DISPOSITION ON 10/14/15 . FOR (MODERN FINANCE CO. INC.) . AGAINST (ARELLANO, MISAEL) . PRINCIPAL $ 2500.00 . COSTS $ 80.00 . TOTAL $ 2580.00 . EXECUTION STAYED 30 DAYS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2015
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED AND MAILED TO ALL PARTIES, AND JUDGMENT DEBTOR'S STATEMENT OF ASSETS MAILED TO (ARELLANO, MISAEL) .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2015
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM FILED. SERVED AS TO (ARELLANO, MISAEL) BY SUB-SERVING BETH ARELLANO - SISTER . COSTS OF $ 30.00 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2015
  • PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO DEFENDANT FILED. RECEIPT # LAV . HEARING SET FOR 10/14/15 AT 08:30A M, IN DEPT. NWZ

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MODERN FINANCE COMPANY INC. is a litigant