This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/20/2018 at 03:25:24 (UTC).

MMF INVESTMENTS, LLC VS VALLERY, RONALD

Case Summary

On 03/15/2013 MMF INVESTMENTS, LLC filed a Property - Commercial Eviction lawsuit against VALLERY, RONALD. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, San Pedro Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0278

  • Filing Date:

    03/15/2013

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Commercial Eviction

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Pedro Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MMF INVESTMENTS LLC

Defendant

VALLERY RONALD

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

SIEBIG, STEVEN J.

SIEBIG STEVEN J.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/31/2013
  • RETURN ON ATTACHMENT/EXECUTION FILED BY THE SHERIFF'S. WRIT FULLY RETURN ON ATTACHMENT/EXECUTION FILED BY THE SHERIFF'S. WRIT FULLY SATISFIED AS TO POSSESSION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2013
  • APPLICATION FOR ISSUANCE OF WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED APPLICATION FOR ISSUANCE OF WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2013
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION OF REAL PROPERTY ISSUED TO LA COUNTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2013
  • CLERK'S NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED AND MAILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2013
  • WRIT REJECT LETTER MAILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2013
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION OF REAL PROPERTY REJECTED (LA COUNTY) * * REJECTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2013
  • SUBMISSION FOR DEFAULT AND JUDGMENT PENDING *** DEFAULT PROCESSE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2013
  • PROOF OF SERVICE TO COMPLAINT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2013
  • PROOF OF SERVICE FOR ALL OTHER OCCUPANTS FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2013
  • DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY CLERK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2013
  • REQUEST FOR DEFAULT FILED AND ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2013
  • DEFAULT ENTERED FOR ALL OTHER OCCUPANTS PURSUANT TO CCP 415.46 DEFAULT ENTERED FOR ALL OTHER OCCUPANTS PURSUANT TO CCP 415.46

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2013
  • APPLICATION AND ORDER TOSERVE SUMMONS BY POSTING SIGNED & FILED. APPLICATION AND ORDER TOSERVE SUMMONS BY POSTING SIGNED & FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2013
  • APPLICATION AND ORDER TO SERVE SUMMONS BY POSTING SUBMITTED APPLICATION AND ORDER TO SERVE SUMMONS BY POSTING SUBMITTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2013
  • NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER MAILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2013
  • COMPLAINT FILED Filing Fee: 240.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2013
  • SUMMONS FILED

    Read MoreRead Less