Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 02/14/2020 at 07:38:09 (UTC).

MISTY FOREST VS JEROME C TROST

Case Summary

On 05/03/2019 MISTY FOREST filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against JEROME C TROST. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Bellflower Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is CAROL ROSE. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2244

  • Filing Date:

    05/03/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Bellflower Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

CAROL ROSE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FOREST MISTY

Defendant

TROST JEROME C

 

Court Documents

Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims) - Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

7/22/2019: Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims) - Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

7/22/2019: Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims) - Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

10/11/2019: Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims) - Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Small Claims Appeal - Trial De Novo) of 10/11/2019, Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets

10/11/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Small Claims Appeal - Trial De Novo) of 10/11/2019, Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets

Minute Order - Minute Order (Small Claims Appeal - Trial De Novo)

10/11/2019: Minute Order - Minute Order (Small Claims Appeal - Trial De Novo)

Notice of Appeal on Small Claims Judgment - Notice of Appeal on Small Claims Judgment

8/21/2019: Notice of Appeal on Small Claims Judgment - Notice of Appeal on Small Claims Judgment

Notice of Hearing on Small Claims Appeal - Notice of Hearing on Small Claims Appeal

8/21/2019: Notice of Hearing on Small Claims Appeal - Notice of Hearing on Small Claims Appeal

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 07/22/2019, Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets

7/22/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 07/22/2019, Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets

Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims) - Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

5/14/2019: Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims) - Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

5/3/2019: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/11/2019
  • DocketCourt orders judgment after trial de novo entered for Plaintiff MISTY FOREST against Defendant JEROME C TROST on the Plaintiff's Claim filed by MISTY FOREST on 05/03/2019 for the principal amount of $600.00 and costs of $70.00 for a total of $670.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • DocketUpdated -- On the Plaintiff's Claim filed by MISTY FOREST on 05/03/2019, judgment entered on 07/22/2019 is vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • DocketOn the Plaintiff's Claim filed by MISTY FOREST on 05/03/2019, judgment entered on 07/22/2019 as to JEROME C TROST is

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • DocketMinute Order (Small Claims Appeal - Trial De Novo)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Small Claims Appeal - Trial De Novo) of 10/11/2019, Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • DocketSmall Claims Appeal - Trial De Novo scheduled for 10/11/2019 at 08:30 AM in Bellflower Courthouse at Department 1 updated: Result Date to 10/11/2019; Result Type to Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • DocketUpdated -- Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims): Result: Vacated; Result Date: 10/11/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2019
  • DocketNotice of Appeal on Small Claims Judgment; Filed by: JEROME C TROST (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2019
  • DocketSmall Claims Appeal - Trial De Novo scheduled for 10/11/2019 at 08:30 AM in Bellflower Courthouse at Department 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2019
  • DocketNotice of Hearing on Small Claims Appeal; Issued by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2019
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 07/22/2019 at 08:30 AM in Bellflower Courthouse at Department 1 updated: Result Date to 07/22/2019; Result Type to Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2019
  • DocketCourt orders judgment entered for Plaintiff MISTY FOREST against Defendant JEROME C TROST on the Plaintiff's Claim filed by MISTY FOREST on 05/03/2019 for the principal amount of $492.00 and costs of $70.00 for a total of $562.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2019
  • DocketMinute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2019
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 07/22/2019, Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2019
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2019
  • DocketProof of Service - Personal (Small Claims); Filed by: MISTY FOREST (Plaintiff); As to: JEROME C TROST (Defendant); Service Cost: 40.00; Service Cost Waived: No; Service Date: 05/09/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2019
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: MISTY FOREST (Plaintiff); As to: JEROME C TROST (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2019
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Carol Rose in Department 1 Bellflower Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2019
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 07/22/2019 at 08:30 AM in Bellflower Courthouse at Department 1

    Read MoreRead Less