This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/30/2021 at 04:00:05 (UTC).

MIRZA, ANDREAS VS WORLD GOLD GROUP

Case Summary

On 06/21/2012 MIRZA, ANDREAS filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against WORLD GOLD GROUP. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Inglewood Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is CAROL J. HALLOWITZ. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0906

  • Filing Date:

    06/21/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Courthouse:

    Inglewood Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

CAROL J. HALLOWITZ

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MIRZA ANDREAS

Defendant

WORLD GOLD GROUP INC DBA AURUM ADVISORS

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/27/2013
  • Docket* EFFECTIVE 05/28/2013

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/27/2013
  • Docket* CASE REASSIGNED TO THE INGLEWOOD COURTHOUSE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/27/2013
  • Docket* CASE RENUMBERED FROM LAW12W00906 TO ING12SX0906

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/02/2012
  • DocketWRIT OF EXECUTION ISSUED TO LOS ANGELES COUNTY. . RECEIPT # LAW538978003 .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2012
  • DocketNOTICE/LETTER RE: NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT RETURNED AS TO (WORLD GOLD GROUP),(INC) DBA (AURUM ADVISORS) DUE TO RETURN TO SENDER .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/31/2012
  • DocketNOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED AND MAILED TO ALL PARTIES, AND JUDGMENT DEBTOR'S STATEMENT OF ASSETS MAILED TO (WORLD GOLD GROUP),(INC) DBA (AURUM ADVISORS) .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/31/2012
  • DocketNOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED AND MAILED TO ALL PARTIES.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/31/2012
  • DocketCASE FILE RETURNED TO SMALL CLAIMS OFFICE FROM COURTROOM .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/31/2012
  • DocketCAUSE CALLED AT 01:30P M, IN DEPT. 092 , HON. CAROL J. HALLOWITZ, COMM'R PRESIDING FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING. PLAINTIFF APPEARING . NO APPEARANCE BY OR FOR DEFENDANT .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/31/2012
  • DocketJUDGMENT ENTERED AS A FINAL DISPOSITION ON 08/31/12 . FOR (MIRZA, ANDREAS) . AGAINST (WORLD GOLD GROUP),(INC) DBA (AURUM ADVISORS) . PRINCIPAL $ 3637.00 . COSTS $ 125.00 . TOTAL $ 3762.00 . EXECUTION STAYED 30 DAYS. DEFAULT JUDGMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/08/2012
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM FILED. SERVED AS TO (WORLD GOLD GROUP),(INC) DBA (AURUM ADVISORS) BY SUB-SERVING FEMALE JANE DOE, RECEPTIONIST . MATTER SET FOR HEARING ON 08/31/12 AT 01:30P M, IN DEPT. 092 COSTS OF $ 75.00 . SEX: FEMALE-AGE: 45-SKIN: HISPANIC-HAIR: BROWN-HEIGHT: 5'5"- WEIGHT: 160LBS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/16/2012
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR POSTPONEMENT (BEFORE SERVICE) FILED 1ST REQUEST, FILED AT WINDOW .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/16/2012
  • DocketMATTER RE-SCHEDULED FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING ON 08/31/12 AT 01:30P M, IN DEPT. 092 .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/21/2012
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO DEFENDANT FILED. RN LAW267395. HEARING SET FOR 07/30/12 AT 01:30 PM IN DPT. 092.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less