This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/19/2019 at 14:55:45 (UTC).

MIRACLE MILE PROPERTIES L.P. VS GRACIFREDO FARIAS, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 02/27/2018 MIRACLE MILE PROPERTIES L P filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against GRACIFREDO FARIAS. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, West Covina Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is SUSAN J. TOWNSEND. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0530

  • Filing Date:

    02/27/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

SUSAN J. TOWNSEND

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MIRACLE MILE PROPERTIES L.P.

Defendants

OROZCO BLANCA

Azusa, CA 91702

FARIAS GRACIFREDO

Azusa, CA 91702

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MELLO KEVIN HERMAN

 

Court Documents

Writ - Return

4/12/2018: Writ - Return

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

2/27/2018: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Property Owner/Landlord Only Hearing Notice

2/27/2018: Property Owner/Landlord Only Hearing Notice

Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - (Gracifredo Farias)

2/28/2018: Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - (Gracifredo Farias)

Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - (ALL OCCUPANTS)

2/28/2018: Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - (ALL OCCUPANTS)

Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - (Blanca Orozco)

2/28/2018: Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - (Blanca Orozco)

Complaint

2/27/2018: Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

2/27/2018: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - on Complaint

2/27/2018: Summons - on Complaint

Writ of (name extension) - POSSESSION (mailed)

3/16/2018: Writ of (name extension) - POSSESSION (mailed)

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

3/13/2018: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Proof of Personal Service

3/13/2018: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

3/13/2018: Proof of Personal Service

Judgment - Unlawful Detainer

3/16/2018: Judgment - Unlawful Detainer

Application for Writ of Possession

3/16/2018: Application for Writ of Possession

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/12/2018
  • DocketWrit - Return ( Wholly Satisfied);; Costs Credits: 0.00; Interest Credits: 0.00; Principal Credits: 0.00; Possession: Yes; Judgment Satisfaction Type: Wholly Satisfied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2018
  • DocketJudgment - Unlawful Detainer; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2018
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 05/09/2018 at 08:30 AM in West Covina Courthouse at Civil Clerk's Office Not Held - Vacated by Court on 03/16/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2018
  • DocketDefault judgment entered for Plaintiff Miracle Mile Properties L.P. against Defendant Gracifredo Farias and Defendant Blanca Orozco on the Complaint filed by Miracle Mile Properties L.P. on 02/27/2018 for a total of $0.00.; Judgment for possession is not granted against all unnamed occupants pursuant to Code of Civil Procedure section 415.46.; Restitution and possession of the premises located at 855 S.Citrus Avenue, #107, Azusa, CA 91702 is granted for plaintiff(s)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2018
  • DocketApplication for Writ of Possession; Filed by: Miracle Mile Properties L.P. (Plaintiff); Daily Rental Value: 56.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2018
  • DocketWrit of POSSESSION (mailed); Issued by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2018
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Miracle Mile Properties L.P. (Plaintiff); As to: Blanca Orozco (Defendant); Service Date: 02/27/2018; Service Cost: 0.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2018
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by: Miracle Mile Properties L.P. (Plaintiff); As to: Gracifredo Farias (Defendant); Blanca Orozco (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2018
  • DocketDefault entered as to Gracifredo Farias; Blanca Orozco; On the Complaint filed by Miracle Mile Properties L.P. on 02/27/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2018
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Miracle Mile Properties L.P. (Plaintiff); As to: Gracifredo Farias (Defendant); Service Date: 02/27/2018; Service Cost: 0.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2018
  • DocketNotice of Unlawful Detainer mailed 02/28/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Miracle Mile Properties L.P. (Plaintiff); As to: Gracifredo Farias (Defendant); Blanca Orozco (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2018
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Miracle Mile Properties L.P. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2018
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2018
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2018
  • DocketProperty Owner/Landlord Only Hearing Notice; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2018
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Susan J. Townsend in Department 6 West Covina Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2018
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 05/09/2018 at 08:30 AM in West Covina Courthouse at Civil Clerk's Office

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MIRACLE MILE PROPERTIES INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MELLO, KEVIN H